EP 0032740 A3 19820127 - MULTICHANNEL MAGNETIC HEAD AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR
Title (en)
MULTICHANNEL MAGNETIC HEAD AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR
Publication
Application
Priority
JP 430380 A 19800118
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0032740A2] Disclosed is a multichannel magnetic head having magnetic circuits for respective channels, each positioned to traverse a magnetic flux ( phi ) to be detected, and a Hall element disposed in the magnetic circuits and used as magnetic-electric converter. The Hall element (14) is an amorphous magnetic thin film which consists essentially of an alloy containing a rare earth element (e.g. Gd) and a transition metal (e.g. Co). To the amorphous magnetic thin film (14) there are connected to a pair of current terminals (20, 22) and Hall voltage terminals (161-164). The Hall voltage terminals are provided in the same numbers as the annels or the magnetic circuits (71-74).
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G01R 33/07 (2006.01); G11B 5/29 (2006.01); G11B 5/37 (2006.01); G11B 5/49 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
G11B 5/29 (2013.01 - EP US); G11B 5/372 (2013.01 - EP US); G11B 5/4946 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- US 4126494 A 19781121 - IMAMURA NOBUTAKE, et al
- DE 2912309 A1 19791011 - OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO
- EP 0012649 A1 19800625 - THOMSON CSF [FR]
- DE 1102251 B 19610316 - SIEMENS AG
- US 3686751 A 19720829 - SUGIYAMA KEIJI
- GB 1468551 A 19770330 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD
- IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Vol. 18, No. 12, May 1976, pages 4214-4217 Armonk, N.Y., U.S.A. R.J. GAMBINO et al.: "Magnetic films for hall effect devices useful for magnetic recording heads" * page 4214, paragraphs 1, 2; page 4216, paragraphs 3-6; page 4217, last paragraph; figures 2A, 2B *
- PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 1, No. 8, March 16, 1977, page 277E76; & JP-A-51 113 722, (HITACHI) (07-10-1976)
- AUTOMATION AND REMOTE CONTROL, Vol. 34, No. 3/II, March 1973, pages 504-505 New York, U.S.A. M.A. BOYARCHENKOV et al.: "Information output device for logic and switching elements based on ferromagnetic single crystals" * page 505; figure 1 *
- PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 3, No. 31, March 16, 1979, page 87E98; & JP-A-54 010 711, (TOKYO SHIBAURA) 26-01-1979.
- IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Vol. 18, No. 3, August 1975, pages 940-941 Armonk, N.Y., U.S.A. K.Y. AHN: "All-amorphous film single level masking bubble devices and fabrication method".
- PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 3, No. 28, March 9, 1979, page 141E96; & JP-A-54 007 317, (SONY) (20-01-1979).
- IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Vol. 18, No. 12, May 1976, page 4218 New York, U.S.A. R.J. GAMBINO et al.: "GdxFey and GdCoFe materials for magnetic head hall sensors" * page 4218, paragraphs 1-3 *
- PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 3, No. 67, June 9, 1979, page 63E116; & JP-A-54 046 022, (HITACHI) 11-04-1979.
- PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 1, No. 107, September 21, 1977, page 3580E77; & JP-A-52 038 913, (MATSUSHITA) 25-03-1977.
- NEUES AUS DER TECHNIK, No. 4, August 1978, page 4 Wuerzburg, DE. "Ein besonderer Schreib-/Lesekopf fuer Magnetaufzeichnung, insbesondere fuer Mehrspuraufnahmen".
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE GB NL
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0032740 A2 19810729; EP 0032740 A3 19820127; JP S56101617 A 19810814; US 4393427 A 19830712
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 81100319 A 19810116; JP 430380 A 19800118; US 22019780 A 19801223