Global Patent Index - EP 0051309 B2

EP 0051309 B2 2000-12-06 - Window

Title (en)

Window

Title (de)

Fenster

Title (fr)

Fenêtre

Publication

EP 0051309 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 81109419 A

Priority

  • DE 3041399 A
  • DE 3043926 A
  • DE 3111347 A
  • DE 3111579 A
  • DE 3120940 A
  • DE 3120941 A
  • DE 3127833 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0051309A2] In a window or the like comprising a frame and a casement, driving-rod means being arranged on at least one part of the casement legs, preferably in the rebate region, to perform window functions, for example tilt readiness, turn readiness and close-and-lock, and these driving-rod means being movable in the longitudinal direction of the respective casement leg by manual actuation means which can be set successively in different functional positions, it is proposed that the casement (12) be lockable in a part-open position against complete closing and further opening, by fixing means (42) through the agency of the driving-rod means (26). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/52; E05D 15/526

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/52 (2006.01); E05D 15/526 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/021 (2013.01); E05C 9/066 (2013.01); E05C 9/24 (2013.01); E05D 15/52 (2013.01); E05D 15/526 (2013.01); E05C 17/24 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0051309 A2 19820512; EP 0051309 A3 19850626; EP 0051309 B1 19910918; EP 0051309 B2 20001206; YU 258981 A 19831031; YU 41380 B 19870228

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-12-06 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

2000-11-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001106

- Year of fee payment: 20

2000-10-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20001019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2000-08-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

1998-10-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 19981020

- Year of fee payment: 18

1998-01-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SIEGENIA-FRANK KG * 920616 ROTO FRANK AG

- Effective date: 19920615

1997-07-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

1997-06-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1996-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Effective date: 19961031

1996-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Effective date: 19961031

1996-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Effective date: 19961031

1995-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 19951030

- Year of fee payment: 15

1995-10-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 19951020

- Year of fee payment: 15

1995-01-31 [EAL] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN

1994-12-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SIEGENIA-FRANK KG * 920616 ROTO FRANK AG

- Effective date: 19920615

1992-08-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEGENIA-FRANK KG

- Effective date: 19920615

1992-08-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ROTO FRANK AG

- Effective date: 19920616

1992-01-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1991-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 3177257 19911024

1991-10-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

1991-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

1991-09-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19910918

1991-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 67554 T 19911015

1991-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUG. WINKHAUS GMBH & CO. KG

1986-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19861114

1985-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19850823

1985-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

1982-11-03 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05D 15/52

1982-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE