Global Patent Index - EP 0097969 A1

EP 0097969 A1 1984-01-11 - A plasticized thermoplastic polymer.

Title (en)

A plasticized thermoplastic polymer.

Title (de)

Plastifiziertes thermoplastisches Polymer.

Title (fr)

Polymère thermoplastique plastifié.

Publication

EP 0097969 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 83106346 A

Priority

US 39355782 A

Abstract (en)

Described herein is a plasticized thermoplastic polymer composition comprising in admixture, a thermoplastic polymer selected from a polyarylate, a polyetherimide, an aromatic polycarbonate, a poly(aryl ether) having a molecular weight in excess of 10,000 and a plasticizing amount of a poly(aryl ether) having a molecular weight of from about 1,000 to about 5,000.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08L 67/02; C08L 69/00; C08L 71/00; C08L 79/08; C08L 81/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08L 69/00 (2006.01); C08L 67/00 (2006.01); C08L 67/03 (2006.01); C08L 71/00 (2006.01); C08L 79/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08L 71/00 (2013.01); C08L 67/03 (2013.01); C08L 79/08 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08L 79/08 + C08L 71/00 + C08L 71/00
  2. C08L 67/02 + C08L 71/00 + C08L 71/00
  3. C08L 69/00 + C08L 71/00 + C08L 71/00
  4. C08L 71/00 + C08L 71/00 + C08L 79/08 + C08L 67/02 + C08L 69/00
  5. C08L 67/03 + C08L 2666/14
  6. C08L 71/00 + C08L 2666/14
  7. C08L 79/08 + C08L 2666/18
  8. C08L 79/08 + C08L 69/00
  9. C08L 79/08 + C08L 2666/14

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0097969 A1 19840111; CA 1205236 A 19860527; JP S5912967 A 19840123

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DICKINSON, BARRY LEE

1988-03-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 19871018

1986-12-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AMOCO CORPORATION

1984-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19840210

1984-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE