EP 0099333 A1 19840125 - Transfer sheets for the thermal dry-printing of cellulosic fibres.
Title (en)
Transfer sheets for the thermal dry-printing of cellulosic fibres.
Title (de)
Umdruckträger für den thermischen Trockendruck von Cellulosefasern.
Title (fr)
Supports provisoires pour la thermo-impression à sec de fibres cellulosiques.
Publication
Application
Priority
CH 422582 A 19820712
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO8400325A1] The carrier surface is used for dry thermal printing by means of colorants which are not water soluble at a temperature of 60<o>C, of water-swollen cellulose fibers. The colorants are hardly vaporizable and may not be transferred in a conventional printing process. The colorants are transferred to the cellulose fibers which are dewatered and stabilized by addition of polyglycol, at a temperature of 230<o>C and a pressure ranging from 10<4> to 10<6> Pa, by means of a paper sheet provided with a transfer layer. In order to increase the penetration of colorants into the textile structure, it is recommended to lower the air pressure in the transfer area down to a pressure ranging from 1 to 5 x 10<4> Pa.
Abstract (de)
Umdruckträger für den thermischen Trockendruck von Cellulosefasern, die mit Wasser aufquellbar sind, mit Farbstoffen, die bei 60°C in Wasser unlöslich sind. Die Farbstoffe sind schwer verdampfbar und können nicht im konventionellen Transferdruck-Verfahren übertragen werden. Sie werden bei etwa 230°C und einem Anpressdruck von 10<4> bis 10<6> Pa von dem mit einer Release-Schicht versehenen Basispapier auf die Cellulosefasern übertragen, die mit Wasser aufgequollen wurden und deren Quellungszustand mit einem Polyglykol nach dem Wasserentzug konserviert wird. Zur Erhöhung der Penetration des Farbstoffs in die Textilstruktur wird empfohlen, den Luftdruck im Transfergebiet auf 1 bis 5 x 10<4> Pa zu erniedrigen.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B41M 3/12 (2006.01); B41M 5/025 (2006.01); D06P 5/00 (2006.01); D06P 5/28 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
D06P 5/005 (2013.01 - EP US); Y10S 8/918 (2013.01 - US)
Citation (applicant)
- FR 1223330 A 19600616 - FILATURES PROUVOST & CIE LA LA
- FR 1585119 A 19700109
- CH 564637 B5 19750731
- EP 0036639 A2 19810930 - DONCROFT COLORS & CHEM [US]
- DE 1811796 A1 19700806 - DU PONT
- DE 1811796 A1 19700806 - DU PONT
- CH 231679 A 19440415 - SOC D PRODUITS CHIMIQUES DES T [FR]
- FR 2451270 A1 19801010 - SUBLISTATIC HOLDING SA [CH]
- JP H05246188 A 19930924 - TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD, et al
- EISELE; FIEBIG, MELLIAND LEXTILBERICHTE, vol. 61, 1980, pages 956 - 961
- VALKO; LIMDI, TEXTILE RESEARCH JOURNAL, vol. 32, 1962, pages 331 - 337
- CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 40685E
Citation (search report)
- [X] FR 2193908 A1 19740222 - TOYO BOSEKI [JP]
- [X] EP 0020292 A1 19801210 - SUBLISTATIC HOLDING SA [CH]
- [X] FR 2451270 A1 19801010 - SUBLISTATIC HOLDING SA [CH]
- [A] FR 2348256 A1 19771110 - SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al
- [A] DE 2808409 A1 19780921 - SANDOZ AG
- [A] GB 2033930 A 19800529 - BAYER AG
- [XP] EP 0061428 A2 19820929 - CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]
- [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 87, Nr. 6, 8. August 1977, Seite 61, Nr. 40685e, Columbus, Ohio, USA & JP - A - 77 46 188 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO., LTD.) 12.04.1977
- [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 83, Nr. 8, 25. August 1975, Seite 164, Nr. 61492x, Columbus, Ohio, USA & JP - A - 75 13 685 (TOYOBO CO., LTD.) 13.02.1975
- [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 83, Nr. 6, 11. August 1975, Seite 62, Nr. 44631z, Columbus, Ohio, USA & JP - A - 75 18 782 (TOYOBO CO., LTD.) 27.02.1975
- [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 89, Nr. 14, 2. Oktober 1978, Seite 145, Nr. 112236a, Columbus, Ohio, USA & JP - A - 78 28 786 (UNITIKA LTD.) 17.03.1978
- [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 96, Nr. 8, 22. Februar 1982, Seite 82, Nr. 53758s, Columbus, Ohio, USA & JP - A - 81 140 190 (CIBA-GEIGY) 02.11.1981
Designated contracting state (EPC)
IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0099333 A1 19840125; EP 0099333 B1 19860924; AT E22418 T1 19861015; DE 3366444 D1 19861030; EP 0114833 A1 19840808; JP S59501255 A 19840719; US 4682983 A 19870728; WO 8400325 A1 19840202
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 83810295 A 19830630; AT 83810295 T 19830630; CH 8300085 W 19830630; DE 3366444 T 19830630; EP 83901895 A 19830630; JP 50204983 A 19830630; US 84259286 A 19860312