Global Patent Index - EP 0160985 B2

EP 0160985 B2 2001-12-12 - Method and device for calculating relationship between pre-edged lens and spectacle lens

Title (en)

Method and device for calculating relationship between pre-edged lens and spectacle lens

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Berechnen der Beziehung zwischen der Rohlinse und der Brillenlinse

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil pour calculer la relation entre la lentille brute et la lentille des lunettes

Publication

EP 0160985 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 85105655 A

Priority

JP 9139784 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0160985A2] A method for calculating relationship between pre-edged lens and spectacle frame for use in lens edging machine comprising: frame measurement step to digitally measure radius vector value ( rho n, theta n) of the spectacle frame, lens measurement step to digitally measure a configuration of the pre-edged lens held by lens rotation shafts before edging the lens, and comparison step to compare the radius vector value ( rho n, theta n) with the measurement value of the configuration of the pre-edged lens so as to judge whether or not the pre-edged lens can be edged for fitting to the frame, and device for the method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/14 (2006.01); B24B 47/22 (2006.01); G02C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02C 13/003 (2013.01); B24B 47/225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0160985 A2 19851113; EP 0160985 A3 19880302; EP 0160985 B1 19930811; EP 0160985 B2 20011212; DE 3587514 D1 19930916; DE 3587514 T2 19931223; DE 3587514 T3 20020502; JP H0558861 B2 19930827; JP S60238264 A 19851127

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031201

2004-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2003-12-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-05-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030508

2002-07-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-05-31 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2002-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020531

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-05-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020513

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-05-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2002-03-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-02-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: WERNICKE & CO. GMBH

2001-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: WERNICKE & CO. GMBH

2001-02-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: WERNICKE & CO. GMBH * 19940511 WERNICKE & CO. GMBH

- Effective date: 19940510

2001-01-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: WERNICKE & CO. GMBH * 19940511 WERNICKE & CO. GMBH

- Effective date: 19940510

1994-09-16 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: WERNICKE & CO. GMBH

1994-07-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WERNICKE & CO. GMBH

- Effective date: 19940510

1994-07-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WERNICKE & CO. GMBH

- Effective date: 19940511

1993-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1993-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 3587514 19930916

1993-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1993-07-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1990-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19900111

1989-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOPCON

1988-10-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19880829

1988-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1988-01-27 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B24B 9/14

1985-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL