Global Patent Index - EP 0163473 A3

EP 0163473 A3 1987-08-26 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR

Publication

EP 0163473 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 85303548 A

Priority

GB 8413599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0163473A2] An electrical connector member includes a cylindrical outer shell (1) which encloses a bonded insulating insert assembly (2) having a plurality of axial passages (7) for electrical contacts. The insert assembly includes a rigid main insert (3), a rigid wafer (4), a rubber grommet (6) and a rubber seal (5). The shell has an internal shoulder (8) which provides a stop for a collar (9) provided on the insert (3). A dish shaped resilient beryllium copper retention ring (11) having a plurality of axially directed slots (12) is placed in an internal annular recess (10) in the shell before the insert assembly is inserted into the shell. When the insert assembly is inserted, the smaller diameter edge (16) of the retention ring slides over the collar (9) until, on full insertion, the edge (16) snaps firmly against the shoulder (14) of the collar. The insert is then firmly supported in the shell by the spring force of the retention ring and requires no encapsulation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/508

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/508 (2006.01); H01R 13/627 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6277 (2013.01); H01R 13/508 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0163473 A2 19851204; EP 0163473 A3 19870826; GB 8413599 D0 19840704

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHARD, RONALD

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FOX, ALAN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WATSON, DONALD LEONARD

1991-05-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 19901103

1990-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19900622

1989-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19880711

1988-08-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FKI ELECTRICAL COMPONENTS LIMITED

1988-08-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FKI ELECTRICAL COMPONENTS LIMITED (FORMERLY THORN

1987-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1985-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT