EP 0175963 B1 19880713 - JACQUARD DOUBLE PLUSH FABRIC
Title (en)
JACQUARD DOUBLE PLUSH FABRIC
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 3434351 A 19840919
Abstract (en)
[origin: US4756340A] A Jacquard double plush fabric for subsequent division into upper and lower fabric portions includes a plurality of sheds with a single weft for each of the sheds and a U-shaped pile thread for the respective single weft, and dead thread groups woven into and distributed within the upper and the lower fabric portions, and a method and an apparatus for producing the fabric.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
D03C 3/12 (2006.01); D03C 13/00 (2006.01); D03D 27/10 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
D03D 27/10 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : N.V. Michel van de Wiele
- BE 896102 A 19830701 - TAPIJTENWEVERIJ NV
- DE 2939714 B1 19801016 - ZANGS AG MASCHF
- NL 7213679 A 19740416
- DE 1535782 A1 19700305 - LIBREX ANSTALT SOC
- DD 213246 A5 19840905 - WIELE INT PVBA VAN DE [BE]
- FR 1050774 A 19540111 - LEHEMBRE & CIE A
- DE 7433849 U
- US 3327738 A 19670627 - JAN SABBE
- BE 569205 A
- "Großes Textillexikon", KOCH-SATLOW, 1965, Anstalt Stuttgart, pages 630 - 635
- "Textilberichte", NELIANT, April 1967 (1967-04-01), pages 369 - 403
- DIPL.-ING. J.SCHNEIDER, WEBEREI VERFAHREN UND MASCHINEN FÜR DIE GEWEBEHERSTELLUNG, 1968, Göttingen / Heidelberg, pages 22, 23 und 198 - 203
- MICHEL VAN DE WIELE, WEAVE CATALOGUE 1983, pages 42, 43, 49, 51
- RECHNUNG NR. 831573 DER DRUCKEREI DELABIE ÜBER 1.000 EXEMPLARE VON VDW 12
- N.V. VAN DE WIELE-ZEICHNUNG NR. 67932, 18 October 1964 (1964-10-18)
- N.V. VAN DE WIELE-ZEICHNUNG NR. 67934, 28 October 1964 (1964-10-28)
- N.V. VAN DE WIELE-ZEICHNUNG NR. 69031, 16 November 1965 (1965-11-16)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH FR GB IT LI LU NL SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
US 4756340 A 19880712; AT E35701 T1 19880715; CA 1255998 A 19890620; DD 239615 A5 19861001; DE 3434351 C1 19851010; EP 0175963 A1 19860402; EP 0175963 B1 19880713; EP 0175963 B2 19910109; ES 289099 U 19860601; ES 289099 Y 19870201; ES 547103 A0 19860901; ES 547104 A0 19860901; ES 8609525 A1 19860901; ES 8609526 A1 19860901; GR 852010 B 19860110; IE 56864 B1 19920101; IE 852164 L 19860319; IL 76135 A0 19851231; JP S61124648 A 19860612; PT 81152 A 19851001; PT 81152 B 19870819; TR 23090 A 19890313; ZA 856557 B 19860430
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 7390787 A 19870713; AT 85111052 T 19850902; CA 490876 A 19850917; DD 28064385 A 19850916; DE 3434351 A 19840919; EP 85111052 A 19850902; ES 289099 U 19850919; ES 547103 A 19850919; ES 547104 A 19850919; GR 850102010 A 19850819; IE 216485 A 19850902; IL 7613585 A 19850819; JP 20549685 A 19850919; PT 8115285 A 19850918; TR 4886985 A 19850917; ZA 856557 A 19850828