EP 0215612 A2 19870325 - Silver halide photographic emulsions with novel grain faces (5).
Title (en)
Silver halide photographic emulsions with novel grain faces (5).
Title (de)
Photographische Silberhalogenidemulsionen mit Kornoberfläche.
Title (fr)
Emulsions photographiques à l'halogénure d'argent avec des grains à faces.
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 77227185 A 19850903
- US 81113285 A 19851219
- US 81113385 A 19851219
Abstract (en)
Silver halide photographic emulsions comprised of radiation sensitive silver grains of a cubic crystal lattice structure having ruffled faces and photographic elements including these emulsions are disclosed.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G03C 1/00 (2006.01); G03C 1/005 (2006.01); G03C 1/035 (2006.01); G03C 1/047 (2006.01); G03C 1/07 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G03C 1/0051 (2013.01); G03C 1/035 (2013.01); G03C 1/047 (2013.01); G03C 1/07 (2013.01); G03C 2001/0055 (2013.01); G03C 2001/03511 (2013.01); G03C 2200/03 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- US 3817756 A 19740618 - CLAES F, et al
- US 4434226 A 19840228 - WILGUS HERBERT S [US], et al
- US 4439520 A 19840327 - KOFRON JAMES T [US], et al
- US 4414310 A 19831108 - DAUBENDIEK RICHARD L [US], et al
- US 4425425 A 19840110 - ABBOTT THOMAS I [US], et al
- US 4399215 A 19830816 - WEY JONG-SHINN [US]
- US 4433048 A 19840221 - SOLBERG JOHN C [US], et al
- US 4414304 A 19831108 - DICKERSON ROBERT E [US]
- US 4386156 A 19830531 - MIGNOT ANDRE G E [FR]
- US 4478929 A 19841023 - JONES CYNTHIA G [US], et al
- US 4400463 A 19830823 - MASKASKY JOE E [US]
- US 4414306 A 19831108 - WEY JONG-SHINN [US], et al
- US 3206313 A 19650914 - PORTER HENRY D, et al
- US 3317322 A 19670502 - PORTER HENRY D, et al
- US 3367778 A 19680206 - BERRIMAN ROBERT W
- US 3761276 A 19730925 - EVANS F
- US 4504570 A 19850312 - EVANS FRANCIS J [GB], et al
- US 4349622 A 19820914 - KOITABASHI TAKEO, et al
- US 3804629 A 19740416 - HAMMERSTEIN H, et al
- US 4435501 A 19840306 - MASKASKY JOE E [US]
- US 4463087 A 19840731 - MASKASKY JOE E [US]
- US 4183756 A 19800115 - LOCKER DAVID J [US]
- US 4225666 A 19800930 - LOCKER DAVID J, et al
- US 1696830 A 19281225 - PETER WULFF, et al
- JP S5854333 A 19830331 - FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD
- US 3519426 A 19700707 - RAYMOND LEWIS HALWIG [US]
- US 4387154 A 19830607 - WHITMORE KEITH E
- GB 504283 A 19390421 - KODAK LTD, et al
- GB 760775 A 19561107 - KODAK LTD
- US 3140179 A 19640707 - RUSSELL FREDERICK J
- US 3989527 A 19761102 - LOCKER DAVID J
- JAMES: "The Theory of the Photographic Process", 1977, pages: 98
- WYRSCH, INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS OF PHOTOGRAPHIC SCIENCE, vol. 11-13, 1978, pages 122
- BERRY: "Surface Structure and Reactivity of AgBr Dodecahedra", PHOTOGRAPHIC SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, vol. 19, no. 3, May 1975 (1975-05-01), pages 171 - 172
- KLEIN ET AL.: "Formation of Twins of AgBr and AgCl Crystals in Photographic Emulsions", PHOTOGRAPHISCHE KORRESPONDENZ, vol. 99, no. 7, 1963, pages 99 - 102
- MIGNOT, RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, vol. 232, August 1983 (1983-08-01)
- "Research Disclosure", KENNETH MASON PUBLICATIONS, LTD.
- BERRY; SKILLMAN: "Surface Structures and Epitaxial Growth on AgBr Microcrystals", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 35, no. 7, July 1964 (1964-07-01), pages 2165 - 2169
- A. P. H. TRIVELLI; S. E. SHEPPARD: "The Silver Bromide Grain of Photographic Emulsions", 1921
- W. REINDERS: "Studies of Photohalide Crystals", KOLLOID-ZEITSCHRIFT, vol. 9, 1911, pages 10 - 14
- W. REINDERS: "Study of Photohalides III Absorption of Dyes, Proteins and'Other Organic Compounds in Crystalline Silver Chloride", ZEITSCHRIFT FUR PHYSIKALISCHE CHEMIE, vol. 77, 1911, pages 677 - 699
- HIRATA ET AL.: "Crystal Habit of Photographic Emulsion Grains", J. PHOTO SOC. OF JAPAN, vol. 36, 1973, pages 359 - 363
- OPPENHEIMER ET AL.: "Particle Growth and Suspension", 1973, ACADEMIC PRESS, article "Role of Cationic Surfactants in Recrystallization of Aqueous Silver Bromide Dispersions", pages: 159 - 178
- F. C. PHILLIPS: "An Introduction to Crystallography", 1971, JOHN WILEY & SONS
- B.M. SPINELL; C.F. OSTER: "The Encyclopedia of Microscopy and Microtechnique", 1973, article "Photographic Materials", pages: 427 - 434
- RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, vol. 176, December 1978 (1978-12-01)
- RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, vol. 184, August 1979 (1979-08-01)
- ZBINDEN: "Infrared Spectroscopy of HiRh Polymers", 1964, ACADEMIC PRESS, pages: 215
Designated contracting state (EPC)
BE DE FR GB
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0215612 A2 19870325; EP 0215612 A3 19881130; EP 0215612 B1 19930224; CA 1280312 C 19910219; DE 3687808 D1 19930401; DE 3687808 T2 19930902; JP H0812390 B2 19960207; JP S62124552 A 19870605
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 86306797 A 19860903; CA 515953 A 19860814; DE 3687808 T 19860903; JP 20604386 A 19860903