Global Patent Index - EP 0236986 B2

EP 0236986 B2 2000-10-04 - Processing method of light-sensitive silver halide photographic material having good color reproducibility and whiteness

Title (en)

Processing method of light-sensitive silver halide photographic material having good color reproducibility and whiteness

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Behandlung eines photographischen lichtempfindlichen Silberhalogenidmaterials, das eine gute Farb- und Weisswiedergabe besitzt

Title (fr)

Méthode de traitement de matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière ayant une bonne reproduction de couleur et de blanc

Publication

EP 0236986 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 87103258 A

Priority

JP 5094086 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0236986A2] There is disclosed a processing method of light-sensitive silver halide photographic material in which a light-sensitive silver halide photographic material having at least one of silver halide emulsion layers on a reflective support is carried out an image-wise exposure and after a color development processing, immediately performing a bleach-fixing processing without effecting a water washing step, the improvement comprises a magenta coupler represented by the following formula (I) is contained in at least one of the silver halide emulsion layers, <CHEM> wherein Z represents a group of non-metallic atoms necessary for forming a nitrogen-containing heterocyclic ring which may have a substituent; X represents a hydrogen atom or a substituent eliminatable through the reaction with the oxidized product of a color developing agent; and R represents a hydrogen atom or a substituent, total gelatin amount contained in the silver halide emulsion layer containing the magenta coupler and a photographic constituent layer more distant to the layer viewed from the reflective support is 5.0 g/m<2> to l5.0 g/m<2>, and a swelling degree of the light-sensitive silver halide photographic material at the end of the color development processing step is within the range of 220 % to 350 %.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/30 (2006.01); G03C 7/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/3022 (2013.01); G03C 7/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0236986 A2 19870916; EP 0236986 A3 19890531; EP 0236986 B1 19930609; EP 0236986 B2 20001004; JP S63106653 A 19880511

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010228

- Year of fee payment: 15

2000-10-04 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB

1994-05-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.

- Effective date: 19940309

1993-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB

1993-03-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

1993-01-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): GB

1991-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19910620

1990-09-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KONICA CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1990-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19891110

1989-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1987-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB