Global Patent Index - EP 0273588 B2

EP 0273588 B2 2001-03-28 - Sulphurised alkaline earth metal hydrocarbyl phenates, their production and use thereof

Title (en)

Sulphurised alkaline earth metal hydrocarbyl phenates, their production and use thereof

Title (de)

Geschwefelt Erdalkalimetallalkylphenolate, ihre Herstellung und ihre Verwendung

Title (fr)

Alkylphénates de métaux alcalino-terreux sulfurés, leur préparation et leur utilisation

Publication

EP 0273588 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 87310461 A

Priority

GB 8628609 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0273588A1] An additive concentrate suitable for incorporation into a finished lubricating oil composition, the additive concentrate comprising: (a) a lubricating oil, (b) a lubricating oil soluble sulphurised alkaline earth metal hydrocarbyl phenate modified by incorporation of from greater than 2 to 35% by weight based on the weight of the composition of either (i) at least one carboxylic acid having the formula:- R - @@ - COOH (I) wherein R is a C10 to C24 alkyl or alkenyl group and R<1> is either hydrogen, as C1 to C4 alkyl group or a -CH2-COOH group, or an anhydride, acid chloride or ester thereof or (ii) a di- or polycarboxylic acid containing from 36 to 100 carbon atoms or an anhydride, acid chloride or ester thereof, the composition having a TBN greater than 300.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 159/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/14 (2006.01); C10L 1/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/182 (2006.01); C10L 1/183 (2006.01); C10L 1/185 (2006.01); C10L 1/188 (2006.01); C10L 1/19 (2006.01); C10L 1/30 (2006.01); C10M 159/22 (2006.01); C10N 10/04 (2006.01); C10N 20/00 (2006.01); C10N 20/02 (2006.01); C10N 30/02 (2006.01); C10N 30/10 (2006.01); C10N 40/00 (2006.01); C10N 40/25 (2006.01); C10N 70/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 159/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0273588 A1 19880706; EP 0273588 B1 19920812; EP 0273588 B2 20010328; AU 608792 B2 19910418; AU 609075 B2 19910426; AU 8237287 A 19880616; AU 8238087 A 19880616; BR 8707550 A 19890314; BR 8707551 A 19890314; CA 1305696 C 19920728; CA 1305697 C 19920728; CN 1012074 B 19910320; CN 1015642 B 19920226; CN 87108239 A 19880615; CN 87108344 A 19880622; DE 3781118 D1 19920917; DE 3781118 T2 19921217; DE 3781118 T3 20020814; DE 3781126 D1 19920917; DE 3781126 T2 19930304; DE 3781126 T3 20010802; DK 175287 B1 20040809; DK 419788 A 19880727; DK 419788 D0 19880727; DK 419888 A 19880727; DK 419888 D0 19880727; EP 0271262 A1 19880615; EP 0271262 B1 19920812; EP 0271262 B2 20020529; ES 2051751 T3 19940701; ES 2051752 T3 19940701; FI 883502 A0 19880725; FI 883502 A 19880725; FI 883503 A0 19880725; FI 883503 A 19880725; FI 93653 B 19950131; FI 93653 C 19950510; FI 93654 B 19950131; FI 93654 C 19950510; GB 8628609 D0 19870107; GR 3006075 T3 19930621; GR 3006112 T3 19930621; IN 169547 B 19911109; IN 172581 B 19931016; JP H01501399 A 19890518; JP H01501400 A 19890518; JP H0631383 B2 19940427; JP H0631384 B2 19940427; KR 960010991 B1 19960814; KR 960010992 B1 19960814; MX 169105 B 19930622; MX 169106 B 19930622; NO 176147 B 19941031; NO 176147 C 19950208; NO 302763 B1 19980420; NO 883348 A 19880914; NO 883348 D0 19880728; NO 883349 A 19880922; NO 883349 D0 19880728; SG 101092 G 19921204; SG 101192 G 19921204; WO 8803944 A1 19880602; WO 8803945 A1 19880602; ZA 8708938 B 19890726; ZA 8708939 B 19890726

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19991130

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20071125

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LUBRIZOL ADIBIS HOLDINGS (UK) LTD

- Effective date: 20051130

2007-12-19 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061122

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-11-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061117

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-01-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060102

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051126

2004-12-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20041216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041029

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: LUBRIZOL ADIBIS HOLDINGS (UK) LIMITED

2001-07-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-05-25 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-05-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2001-05-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2001-05-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2001-03-28 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2000-07-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2000-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1999-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19991130

1999-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19991130

1999-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19991130

1999-11-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19991127

1999-11-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19991126

1999-10-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

1999-02-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: LUBRIZOL ADIBIS HOLDINGS (UK) LIMITED

1999-01-04 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: LUBRIZOL ADIBIS HOLDINGS (UK) LIMITED

1998-12-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LUBRIZOL ADIBIS HOLDINGS (UK) LIMITED

1998-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 19981130

- Year of fee payment: 12

1998-11-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 19981123

- Year of fee payment: 12

1998-11-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 19981123

- Year of fee payment: 12

1998-11-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LUBRIZOL ADIBIS HOLDINGS (UK) LIMITED

1998-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: BP CHEMICALS (ADDITIVES) LIMITED TRANSFER- LUBRIZOL ADIBIS HOLDINGS (UK) LIMITED * LUBRIZOL ADIBIS HOLDINGS (UK) LIMITED,BELGRAVE H. 76 BUCKINGHAM P. ROAD,LONDON SW1W OSU (GB) TRANSFER- LUBRIZOL ADIBIS HOLDINGS (UK) LIMITED,DOCK ROAD SOUTH BROMBOROUGH,WIRRAL, MERSEYSIDE L62 4SH (GB)

1998-11-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 19981106

- Year of fee payment: 12

1998-11-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 19981102

- Year of fee payment: 12

1995-01-31 [EAL] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN

1994-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2051752 T3

1993-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC.

1993-07-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC.

- Effective date: 19930512

1993-04-30 [REG GR FG4A] VALIDATION IN GREECE

- Free text: 3006075

1992-09-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1992-09-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 3781126 19920917

1992-09-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

1992-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

1992-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 79396 T 19920815

1989-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19890331

1988-10-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19880708

1988-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE