Global Patent Index - EP 0277931 B2

EP 0277931 B2 2000-08-30 - Wear-resistant cast iron with a high phosphorus content

Title (en)

Wear-resistant cast iron with a high phosphorus content

Title (de)

Verschleissfestes Gusseisen mit hohem Phosphorgehalt

Title (fr)

Fonte à haute teneur en phosphore résistant à l'usure

Publication

EP 0277931 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 88870003 A

Priority

BE 8700085 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0277931A2] A cast iron of high phosphorus content, intended especially for the manufacture of brake shoes, offering good wear resistance, is produced by directly incorporating approximately 10% by weight of ferrophosphorus in a liquid casting melt collected in a casting ladle or in a mixer associated with this casting ladle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 37/00; F16D 69/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 37/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0277931 A2 19880810; EP 0277931 A3 19880907; EP 0277931 B1 19920624; EP 0277931 B2 20000830; BE 1000292 A3 19881011; DE 3872262 D1 19920730; DE 3872262 T2 19921203; DK 173189 B1 20000313; DK 56488 A 19880806; DK 56488 D0 19880204; ES 2032602 T3 19930216; ES 2032602 T5 20001216; GR 3005698 T3 19930607; GR 3034788 T3 20010228; NO 170989 B 19920928; NO 170989 C 19930106; NO 880496 A 19880808; NO 880496 D0 19880204

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20080115

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20080113

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20080114

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070118

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080115

2008-03-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-03-03 [NLV7] NL: LAPSED DUE TO REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20080114

2008-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-02-06 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

2008-01-31 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *EURO RAIL A.G.

- Effective date: 20080114

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070504

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-01-26 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-01-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-01-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-01-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-01-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-01-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070117

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-12-05 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061205

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-12-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061204

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-11-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-06-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2006-01-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-12-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUNPAT BRAUN EDER AG

2005-06-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: EURO RAIL AG

- Free text: ABEX RAIL S.A.#9, RUE PIERRE SEMARD#VIERZON (FR) -TRANSFER TO- EURO RAIL AG#FRIEDTALWEG 20#9500 WIL (CH)

2003-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: EURO RAIL AG

2002-12-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20021230

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-20 [REG DE 8570] REINSTATEMENT OF THE FORMER POSITION

2001-01-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2000-12-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-15 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2000-11-08 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2000-10-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-09-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2000-08-30 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-07-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: A. LAMOITIER S.A.

2000-04-26 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: A. LAMOITIER S.A.

- Effective date: 19930319

1995-01-31 [EAL] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN

1994-01-21 [EPTA] LU: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE

1993-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: A.LAMOITIER S.A.

1993-05-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: A. LAMOITIER S.A.

- Effective date: 19930319

1993-03-31 [REG GR FG4A] VALIDATION IN GREECE

- Free text: 3005698

1993-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2032602 T3

1992-10-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

1992-09-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C

1992-07-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 3872262 19920730

1992-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1992-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 77658 T 19920715

1991-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19901207

1989-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABEX RAIL S.A.

1989-02-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19881224

1988-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1988-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE