EP 0300505 A3 19900530 - IMAGE-RECEIVING SHEET FOR THERMAL TRANSFER PRINTING
Title (en)
IMAGE-RECEIVING SHEET FOR THERMAL TRANSFER PRINTING
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 11506588 A 19880511
- JP 18609587 A 19870724
- JP 18609687 A 19870724
- JP 25996887 A 19871015
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0300505A2] An image-receiving sheet for thermal transfer printing comprising on a substrate an intermediate layer made primarily of a resin insoluble in organic solvents, and an image-receiving layer made primarily of a resin soluble in organic solvents and formed on the intermediate layer. This type of sheet is significantly improved in smoothness and blocking properties, enabling one to obtain print images of a very high quality, by thermal transfer printing, which are substantially free from the known problem relating to a missing transfer portion and which are high in the optical density for images as printed.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B41M 5/41 (2006.01); B41M 5/44 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/40 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B41M 5/41 (2013.01); B41M 5/44 (2013.01); B41M 5/5254 (2013.01); B41M 5/5272 (2013.01); B41M 2205/02 (2013.01); B41M 2205/06 (2013.01); B41M 2205/32 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 166 (M-593)(2613) 28 May 1987; & JP-A-61 295 085 (DAINIPPON PRINTING COMPANY LIMITED) 25 December 1986
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 16 (M-554)(2463) 16 January 1987; & JP-A-61 192 595 (RICOH COMPANY LIMITED) 27 August 1986
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 210 (M-166)(1088) 22 October 1982; & JP-A-57 116 692 (RICOH K.K.) 20 July 1982
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 342 (M-536)(2398) 19 November 1986; & JP-A-61 144 394 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO. LTD.) 02 July 1986
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB IT NL
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0300505 A2 19890125; EP 0300505 A3 19900530; EP 0300505 B1 19931013; DE 300505 T1 19890713; DE 3856292 D1 19990211; DE 3856292 T2 19990602; DE 3884877 D1 19931118; DE 3884877 T2 19940317; EP 0545893 A1 19930609; EP 0545893 B1 19981230
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 88111947 A 19880725; DE 3856292 T 19880725; DE 3884877 T 19880725; DE 88111947 T 19880725; EP 93100728 A 19880725