Global Patent Index - EP 0304077 B1

EP 0304077 B1 2000-11-08 - Method of forming a fine pattern

Title (en)

Method of forming a fine pattern

Title (de)

Methode zur Erzeugung eines feinen Musters

Title (fr)

Méthode de formation de motifs fins

Publication

EP 0304077 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 88113503 A

Priority

JP 20674587 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0304077A2] A photoresist is coated on a substrate to form a planar surface, thus to form recessed portions corresponding to a mask of a pattern to be formed in the photoresist layer having planar surface. SiO2 etc. are deposited into the recessed portions to prepare a mask, thus to form a fine pattern by anisotropic etching. As a result, by films remaining below the recessed portions formed in the photoresist layer having planar surface, a fine pattern is formed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/00; G03F 7/26; H01L 21/31; H01L 21/768

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/302 (2006.01); H01L 21/027 (2006.01); H01L 21/3065 (2006.01); H01L 21/311 (2006.01); H01L 21/3213 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/0271 (2013.01); H01L 21/31138 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0304077 A2 19890222; EP 0304077 A3 19900718; EP 0304077 B1 20001108; DE 3856441 D1 20001214; DE 3856441 T2 20010405; JP S6450425 A 19890227; KR 930001956 B1 19930320; US 5032491 A 19910716

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070816

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-08-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030819

2002-08-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020814

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-08-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020808

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 3856441 20001214

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19920630

2000-02-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01L 21/00 A, 7H 01L 21/31 B, 7H 01L 21/768 B, 7G 03F 7/26 B

1992-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19920630

1990-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1989-02-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19880819

1989-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB