EP 0307820 A3 19900822 - THERMAL TRANSFER INK AND FILM
Title (en)
THERMAL TRANSFER INK AND FILM
Publication
Application
Priority
JP 23439987 A 19870918
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0307820A2] A thermal transfer ink composition for an ink ribbon for repeated printing, comprises a resin having a melting point according to JIS-K0064 of 55 to 110 DEG C and a solidification point according to JIS-K0064 being lower at least 5 DEG C than the melting point and a coloring matter.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B41M 5/392 (2006.01); B41M 5/26 (2006.01); B41M 5/30 (2006.01); B41M 5/395 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR)
B41M 5/26 (2013.01 - KR); B41M 5/395 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 4687360 A 19870818 - WELLMAN RUSSEL E [US], et al
- [A] US 4684271 A 19870804 - WELLMAN RUSSEL E [US], et al
- [A] US 4681796 A 19870721 - MAEHASHI TATSUICHI [JP], et al
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 196 (M-601)(2643) 24 June 1987, & JP-A-62 19491 (NIPPON TOKKYO KANRI K.K.) 28 January 1987,
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 191 (M-600)(2638) 19 June 1987, & JP-A-62 16188 (CANON INC) 24 January 1987,
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 291 (M-522)(2347) 03 October 1986, & JP-A-61 106296 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) 24 May 1986,
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE ES FR GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0307820 A2 19890322; EP 0307820 A3 19900822; JP 2584458 B2 19970226; JP S6477581 A 19890323; KR 890004867 A 19890510; KR 910007070 B1 19910916
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 88114766 A 19880909; JP 23439987 A 19870918; KR 880011460 A 19880905