Global Patent Index - EP 0313757 B2

EP 0313757 B2 2000-07-12 - Device for storage and removal of bulk material

Title (en)

Device for storage and removal of bulk material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Lagern und Abtransportieren von Schüttgut

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'emmagasinage et de transport de matériaux en vrac

Publication

EP 0313757 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 88113847 A

Priority

DE 3736392 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0313757A1] If a bulk material mixture produced in a mixer (1) is intermediately stored in a downstream bunker (5), during emptying of said bunker (5) onto a conveying member (10), such as a conveyer belt, a sudden peak loading of the conveying member (10) results when the bottom opening (8) of the elongate bunker (5) is opened. Such peak loadings are to be avoided. In the new device, the bunker (5) has an elongate bottom opening (8) which extends in the longitudinal direction of the conveying member (10) and is subdivided into a plurality of closures (15) arranged in a row. Said closures (15) can be opened individually successively in a controllable sequence. By means of the new device, the bulk material, which is intermediately stored in the bunker (5), is not discharged onto the conveying member (10) over the entire length of the bottom opening (8) of the bunker (5). In contrast, the bunker (5) can be emptied successively stepwise without unnecessary delay occurring. Accordingly, the peak loading of the conveying member (10) can be decreased considerably and evened out. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 90/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/62 (2006.01); B65D 90/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/623 (2013.01); B65D 90/64 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0313757 A1 19890503; EP 0313757 B1 19911211; EP 0313757 B2 20000712; DE 3736392 A1 19890511; DE 3736392 C2 19981105

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2000-12-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-10-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001013

- Year of fee payment: 13

2000-07-12 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE

1992-11-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: M-TEC MATHIS TECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 19920908

1992-03-02 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: IN PAT.BUL.02/92,SHOULD BE DELETED

1992-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 3866854 19920123

1992-01-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

1991-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1991-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 70247 T 19911215

1990-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19900724

1989-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19890315

1989-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE