Global Patent Index - EP 0315553 B2

EP 0315553 B2 2001-04-11 - Multilayer textile composite made from fibre fleeces having different characteristics

Title (en)

Multilayer textile composite made from fibre fleeces having different characteristics

Title (de)

Mehrschichtiges, textiles Komposit aus verschiedene Eigenschaften aufweisenden Faservliesen

Title (fr)

Complexe textile multicouches à base de nappes fibreuses ayant des caractéristiques différentes

Publication

EP 0315553 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 88420363 A

Priority

FR 8715461 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0315553A1] Multilayer textile composite based on fibre sheets (1,2) of different characteristics, the said sheets being bonded together by entangling of the fibres of one of the sheets (1) through the second (2). …<??>It is characterised in that:… - one of the sheets (1) forming part of its composition is based on nonbrittle, flexible synthetic fibres such as polyester, polyamide or polypropylene fibres;… - the other sheet (2) is based on relatively stiff and brittle inorganic fibres (such as glass, asbestos, etc.);… - a minor proportion (3) of the synthetic fibres is implanted in the thickness of the sheet (2) based on inorganic fibres, this being done without projecting at the surface of the latter sheet. …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 5/02; D06N 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/4218 (2012.01); D04H 1/435 (2012.01); D04H 1/4374 (2012.01); D04H 1/498 (2012.01); D04H 5/02 (2012.01); D06N 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 13/00 (2013.01); D04H 1/4218 (2013.01); D04H 1/435 (2013.01); D04H 1/4374 (2013.01); D04H 1/498 (2013.01); D04H 5/02 (2013.01); D04H 5/03 (2013.01); D06N 5/00 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24099 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249953 (2015.04); Y10T 442/159 (2015.04); Y10T 442/59 (2015.04); Y10T 442/647 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0315553 A1 19890510; EP 0315553 B1 19910424; EP 0315553 B2 20010411; DE 3862568 D1 19910529; ES 2021871 T5 20010701; FR 2622604 A1 19890505; FR 2622604 B1 19900119; US 5047276 A 19910910

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20081024

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20081027

2008-11-19 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20081024

2008-10-31 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: ETS LES FILS D'AUGUSTE *CHOMARAT & CIE S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BE20

- Effective date: 20081025

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051011

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071105

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071016

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071105

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071010

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071017

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-10-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061016

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-10-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061010

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-10-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061009

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-05-02 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2001-04-11 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

1998-05-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT ZENTRALE PATENTABTEILUN

- Effective date: 19920124

1992-03-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT ZENTRALE PATENTABTEILUN

- Effective date: 19920124

1991-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 3862568

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1991-05-29

1991-05-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

1991-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

1991-04-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MANZONI & MANZONI

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1990-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19901012

1989-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19890323

1989-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT