Global Patent Index - EP 0315930 B2

EP 0315930 B2 2003-06-25 - Cross-lapper

Title (en)

Cross-lapper

Title (de)

Vliesleger

Title (fr)

Plieuse pour voile

Publication

EP 0315930 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 88118516 A

Priority

DE 3738190 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0315930A2] The invention relates to a cross-lapper (1) with at least two rotating conveyor bands (6, 7) and at least two carriages (4, 5) moved in a reversing manner and accelerated at the reversal points of their travel. To influence the pile thickness in a controlled manner, the band running speed and the travelling speed of the carriages are uncoupled from one another between the acceleration phases and are set differently in relation to one another. For this, there are separate drives (14, 15), especially servo-drives, at least one of which has a freely programmable control (15, 13). In the travel zones between the reversal points of the carriages (4, 5), a constant or variable speed difference in relation to the conveyor bands (6, 7) is produced, this being expressed in a change in the deposited pile thickness (9). When the carriages (4, 5) move faster, the pile becomes thicker, and with the opposite speed difference the pile thickness becomes smaller. …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/46; D01G 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/46 (2006.01); D01G 25/00 (2006.01); D04H 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/74 (2013.01); D01G 25/00 (2013.01); Y10S 493/937 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0315930 A2 19890517; EP 0315930 A3 19900418; EP 0315930 B1 19930512; EP 0315930 B2 20030625; DE 3738190 A1 19890518; DE 3738190 C2 19971016; ES 2043765 T3 19940101; ES 2043765 T5 20040401; US 4944502 A 19900731

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20081106

2008-11-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20081106

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AUTEFA HOLDING G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20051130

2007-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051108

2005-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051108

2004-11-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-11-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20041122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-05-07 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2004-04-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2004-03-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-11-05 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2003-06-25 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

1999-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

1999-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1998-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19981130

1998-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19981130

1998-11-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19981108

1998-11-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19981107

1997-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 19971124

- Year of fee payment: 10

1997-11-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 19971117

- Year of fee payment: 10

1997-11-10 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 19971110

- Year of fee payment: 10

1995-12-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HERGETH HOLLINGSWORTH GMBH

- Effective date: 19940210

1995-12-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ASSELIN

- Effective date: 19951105

1995-11-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AUTEFA HOLDING GMBH

1995-01-31 [EAL] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN

1994-04-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HERGETH HOLLINGSWORTH GMBH

- Effective date: 19940210

1994-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2043765 T3

1993-07-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN

1993-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1993-06-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19930525

1993-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 3880964 19930617

1993-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1993-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 89342 T 19930515

1992-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19920409

1990-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19900914

1990-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1989-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE