Global patent index - EP 0330736 B2

EP 0330736 B2 2000-01-19 - Tensionless plate lock-up

Title (en)

Tensionless plate lock-up

Title (de)

Spannungsloser Plattenverschluss

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage sans tension

Publication

EP 0330736 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 88118939 A

Priority

US 16164088 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0330736A2] A printing cylinder has a longitudinal slot (12) formed in the surface thereof to define an undercut locking surface against which both ends of a flexible printing plate (11) are clamped to hold the plate (11) securely against the surface of the cylinder. Locking means (25) excluding a curved outer surface for contacting the ends of the flexible plate (11) and clamping them against the undercut locking surface are provided. Spring biasing means (32) are disposed in operative compression between the locking means (25) and the bottom of the longitudinal slot (12) to urge the curved outer surface of said locking means (25) outwardly against the undercut locking surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 27/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/1268 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0330736 A2 19890906; EP 0330736 A3 19900822; EP 0330736 B1 19931013; EP 0330736 B2 20000119; CA 1307421 C 19920915; DE 330736 T1 19900208; DE 3884939 D1 19931118; DE 3884939 T2 19940203; DE 3884939 T3 20001228; JP H01229631 A 19890913; JP H07121581 B2 19951225

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051109

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061114

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061114

2007-07-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061115

2006-01-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060102

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-11-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-11-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-11-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051117

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-11-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051109

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-02-25 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-01-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-01-19 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

1998-02-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

1997-07-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

- Owner name: ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION TRANSFER- GOSS

1997-05-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: GOSS GRAPHIC SYSTEMS, INC.

1995-01-31 [EAL] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN

- Ref Document Number: 88118939.3

- Format of ref. document F/P: F

1994-09-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 19940709

1994-02-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1993-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 3884939

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 19931118

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1993-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

1992-09-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19920805

1991-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19901211

1990-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

1990-02-08 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1989-10-27 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1989-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE