Global Patent Index - EP 0341071 B2

EP 0341071 B2 2002-11-13 - Detergent compositions

Title (en)

Detergent compositions

Title (de)

Waschmittelzusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Compositions détergentes

Publication

EP 0341071 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 89304522 A

Priority

GB 8810820 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0341071A2] Mild, foaming detergent compositions of particular use in hand dishwashing comprise an alkyl polyglycoside having a degree of polymerisation of 1 to 3, an anionic active, a surface active betaine and/or amine oxide and, optionally, an ethanolamide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/83; C11D 1/94; C11D 3/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/40 (2006.01); A61K 8/41 (2006.01); A61K 8/42 (2006.01); A61K 8/46 (2006.01); A61K 8/73 (2006.01); A61Q 5/02 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 1/94 (2006.01); C11D 3/32 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/75 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0094 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 1/94 (2013.01); C11D 3/32 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/75 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0341071 A2 19891108; EP 0341071 A3 19900711; EP 0341071 B1 19940803; EP 0341071 B2 20021113; AU 3398989 A 19891109; AU 615740 B2 19911010; BR 8902111 A 19900102; CA 1335876 C 19950613; DE 68917195 D1 19940908; DE 68917195 T2 19941201; DE 68917195 T3 20030403; ES 2056215 T3 19941001; ES 2056215 T5 20030501; GB 8810820 D0 19880608; JP 2664474 B2 19971015; JP H01318089 A 19891222; ZA 8903327 B 19910130

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080506

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080505

2009-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080506

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080505

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080505

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070517

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070526

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-07-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070702

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-05-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070528

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-05-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2003-04-18 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2002-11-13 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011201

2001-05-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010506

2000-05-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20000524

- Year of fee payment: 12

2000-04-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000417

- Year of fee payment: 12

1998-02-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

1998-02-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY

1998-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1997-12-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN * 950501 C

- Effective date: 19950411

1997-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970531

1997-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970531

1996-05-02 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 19960502

- Year of fee payment: 8

1995-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

1995-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY

1995-06-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

- Effective date: 19950411

1995-06-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY

- Effective date: 19950501

1995-06-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

- Effective date: 19950411

1995-01-31 [EAL] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN

1994-10-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI CASETTA & PERANI S.P.A.

1994-10-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1994-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2056215 T3

1994-09-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 68917195 19940908

1994-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1993-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19930521

1992-12-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: UNILEVER PLC

1992-12-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V.

1990-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19900616

1990-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1989-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE