Global Patent Index - EP 0341926 B2

EP 0341926 B2 2001-02-07 - Loudspeaker

Title (en)

Loudspeaker

Title (de)

Lautsprecher

Title (fr)

Haut-parleur

Publication

EP 0341926 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 89304569 A

Priority

GB 8810943 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0341926A1] A compound loudspeaker drive unit is disclosed comprising a low frequency unit having an outwardly and forwardly flaring conical diaphragm (21) and a high frequency drive unit (27) located in or adjacent to the neck of the low frequency conical diaphragm such that the acoustic centres of the two units are substantially coincident and, for a cross-over frequency range in which both drive units contribute significant sound output, the directivity of sound radiation from the high frequency unit (27) as acoustically loaded by the low frequency conical diaphragm (21) is substantially the same as that of the low frequency unit. A magnet structure (28,29,30) for the high frequency unit utilises a magnet (29) formed of neodymium iron boron which enables the high frequency unit (27) to be positioned within a drive coil (23,24) for the low frequency diaphragm while providing a required high value of magnetic flux.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 1/24; H04R 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/24 (2006.01); H04R 9/02 (2006.01); H04R 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/02 (2013.01); H04R 1/24 (2013.01); H04R 9/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0341926 A1 19891115; EP 0341926 B1 19941207; EP 0341926 B2 20010207; AT 115352 T 19941215; AU 3558189 A 19891129; CA 1339519 C 19971028; DE 68919746 D1 19950119; DE 68919746 T2 19950420; DE 68919746 T3 20010613; ES 2065988 T3 19950301; GB 2236929 A 19910417; GB 2236929 B 19921104; GB 8810943 D0 19880615; GB 9023490 D0 19910109; HK 71893 A 19930730; JP 2766862 B2 19980618; JP H03504310 A 19910919; KR 0171567 B1 19990330; NZ 229054 A 19920326; WO 8911201 A1 19891116

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20090505

2009-07-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-07-01 [NLV7] NL: LAPSED DUE TO REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20090505

2009-05-31 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *KH TECHNOLOGY CORP.

- Effective date: 20090505

2009-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080530

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080513

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080515

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080513

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080425

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-05-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030506

- Year of fee payment: 15

2001-05-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-04-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2001-04-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2001-03-09 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-02-28 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2001-02-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. PIOVESANA PAOLO

2001-02-07 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010207

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL SE

1997-01-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIEWA AUDIO B.V.

1997-01-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SEAS FABRIKKER A.S.

1996-11-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SIEWA AUDIO B.V. * 950906 SEAS FABRIKKER A.S.

- Effective date: 19950906

1996-01-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIEWA AUDIO B.V.

1996-01-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SEAS FABRIKKER A.S.

1995-11-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEWA AUDIO B.V.

- Effective date: 19950906

1995-11-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SEAS FABRIKKER A.S.

- Effective date: 19950906

1995-11-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEWA AUDIO B.V.

- Effective date: 19950906

1995-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1995-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2065988 T3

1995-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 68919746 19950119

1994-12-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. PIOVESANA PAOLO

1994-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL SE

1994-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 115352 T 19941215

1994-08-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KH TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

1994-06-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KEF AUDIO (UK) LIMITED

1992-07-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19920616

1990-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19900426

1989-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL SE