Global Patent Index - EP 0342917 B1

EP 0342917 B1 2000-03-22 - Detergent composition

Title (en)

Detergent composition

Title (de)

Detergenszusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition détergente

Publication

EP 0342917 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 89304919 A

Priority

GB 8811672 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0342917A2] A detergent composition for washing fabrics contains a surfactant system in which the major anionic surfactant is an alkyl sulphate of mixed alkyl chain length such that at least 10% by weight of the alkyl chains present in the alkyl sulphate are C12 chains, at least 20% by weight of said alkyl chains are C18 chains and the ratio of C12 alkyl chains to C18 alkyl chains is in the range 9:4 to 1:6. Preferably nonionic surfactant of low HLB value (i.e. less than 10.5) is also present.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/02; C11D 1/14; C11D 1/83

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/37 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 1/37 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0342917 A2 19891123; EP 0342917 A3 19900912; EP 0342917 B1 20000322; EP 0342917 B2 20061025; AU 3475889 A 19891123; AU 611292 B2 19910606; BR 8902281 A 19900109; CA 1335488 C 19950509; DE 68929184 D1 20000427; DE 68929184 T2 20000824; DE 68929184 T3 20070215; ES 2143454 T3 20000516; ES 2143454 T5 20070616; GB 8811672 D0 19880622; IN 168406 B 19910330; JP H0218498 A 19900122; JP H0813984 B2 19960214; KR 960000198 B1 19960103; OA 9118 A 19911031; TR 23981 A 19910114; ZA 8903682 B 19910130

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20090515

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20090518

2009-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090518

2009-06-10 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20090515

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080528

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-06-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

2007-04-20 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2006-10-25 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20061025

2006-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-07-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA * 20001220 THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPAN

- Effective date: 20001215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-02-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-09-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143454

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-05-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 68929184

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-22 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

1993-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19930506

1992-12-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: UNILEVER PLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1992-12-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1990-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19900731

1990-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1989-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE