Global Patent Index - EP 0348608 B2

EP 0348608 B2 2000-10-04 - Method of deposing silicon crystals

Title (en)

Method of deposing silicon crystals

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Freilegen von Silizium-Kristallen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour dégager des cristaux de silicium

Publication

EP 0348608 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 89105763 A

Priority

DE 3822169 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0348608A1] A method is described of exposing silicon crystals on fine- machined, preferably honed surfaces of workpieces made from silicon alloys or from hypereutectic aluminium-silicon alloys such as Al Si 17 Cu 4 Mg, in which the silicon crystals (1) are embedded in a substantially softer matrix (2). To this end, the surface of the workpiece is treated with a brush (4 to 30) subsequently to the fine machining. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 13/10; B24B 33/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 33/02 (2006.01); B24D 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 13/10 (2013.01); B24B 33/02 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0348608 A1 19900103; EP 0348608 B1 19920916; EP 0348608 B2 20001004; DE 3822169 A1 19900104; DE 3822169 C2 19930204

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2002-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021101

2001-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010628

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-03-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-10-04 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-12-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MASCHINENFABRIK GEHRING

- Effective date: 19930611

1999-08-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KADIA PRODUKTION GMBH + CO.

1998-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

1997-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19971231

1997-11-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 19970401

1997-04-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Effective date: 19970401

1996-04-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 19960418

- Year of fee payment: 8

1996-04-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 19960416

- Year of fee payment: 8

1996-02-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

1995-12-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

1995-08-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KADIA-MASCHINENBAU KOPP GMBH & CO.

1993-08-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MASCHINENFABRIK GEHRING

- Effective date: 19930611

1992-11-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

1992-10-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1992-10-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 58902276 19921022

1992-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1992-09-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ANTON AUSSERER

1992-09-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Effective date: 19920916

1991-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19910603

1990-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19900615

1990-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE