Global patent index - EP 0350431 B2

EP 0350431 B2 2000-08-02 - Continuous casting method for production slabs compared to cast condition with a reduced thickness

Title (en)

Continuous casting method for production slabs compared to cast condition with a reduced thickness

Title (de)

Stranggiessverfahren für die Erzeugung von Brammen mit einer gegenüber dem Gusszustand verringerten Dicke

Title (fr)

Procédé de coulée continue pour la fabrication de brames avec une épaisseur réduite en présence d'état brut de coulée

Publication

EP 0350431 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 89730142 A

Priority

  • DE 3822939 A
  • DE 3907905 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0350431A2] The invention relates to a continuous casting method for producing slabs with a reduced thickness compared to cast condition, in which steel is poured into an open-ended mould and a strand which is partially solidified in cross-section is guided between two pairs of rollers and withdrawn by means of driven rollers, and individual rollers from pairs of rollers can be hydraulically adjusted so as to act in a deforming manner with respect to the strand. In order to provide a method with which, even with the continuous casting machine, a product with a high proportion (>/=80%) in rolling texture is made available, which is coilable with the thickness leaving the casting machine, it is proposed that the rotational speed, the current consumption of the driven rollers and the contact pressure of the rollers be measured and each supplied to a controller, that each controller determining the rotational speed of individual driven rollers is adjustable via an overriding controller in such a way that the end measure and the withdrawal speed of the strand are determined by at least one pair of rollers which can be placed against stops, determine the thickness of the strand and act in a deforming manner on part of the strand which has already completely solidified, and that upstream and/or downstream rollers are adjusted in the rotational speed and the current consumption of their drives in dependence on the change in shape of the strand produced by the rollers which can be placed against stops. …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/06; B21B 1/46; B21B 13/22; B22D 11/12; B22D 11/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/128 (2006.01); B21B 1/46 (2006.01); B21B 37/52 (2006.01); B21B 37/62 (2006.01); B22D 11/12 (2006.01); B22D 11/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/463 (2013.01); B21B 37/52 (2013.01); B21B 37/62 (2013.01); B22D 11/1206 (2013.01); B21B 2201/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0350431 A2 19900110; EP 0350431 A3 19910327; EP 0350431 B1 19930602; EP 0350431 B2 20000802; BR 8903264 A 19900213; CA 1330615 C 19940712; CN 1039370 A 19900207; CN 1048669 C 20000126; DE 3907905 A1 19900913; DE 3907905 C2 19990121; ES 2042057 T3 19931201; ES 2042057 T5 20001116; JP 3023114 B2 20000321; JP H0252159 A 19900221; KR 970001551 B1 19970211; US 5018569 A 19910528

INPADOC legal status

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20090611

2009-07-01 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20090611

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080616

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070613

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-06-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-06-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-06-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060615

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030613

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-02-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MANNESMANN A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030613

2003-06-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030613

2003-06-12 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030612

2002-06-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020612

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-06-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020611

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-06-06 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020606

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020531

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020531

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-05-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020517

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010614

- Year of fee payment: 13

2000-11-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Effective date: 20001002

2000-10-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-10-25 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2000-10-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

2000-10-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2000-09-22 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2000-08-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-08-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1995-01-31 [EAL] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN

- Ref Legal Event Code: EAL

1994-07-29 [EPTA] LU: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EPTA

1994-06-16 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH

1994-06-16 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1994-06-16 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT ABT. ZFE GR PA

1994-04-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH

- Effective date: 19940223

1994-04-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 19940228

1994-04-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT ABT. ZFE GR PA +

- Effective date: 19940302

1993-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2042057

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

1993-07-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1993-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 58904550

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1993-07-08

1993-07-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 19930608

1993-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1993-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1993-06-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19930602

1993-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 90014

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 1993-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1992-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19920713

1991-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19910516

1991-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1990-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE