Global Patent Index - EP 0351937 B2

EP 0351937 B2 2001-12-12 - Detergent compositions and process for preparing them

Title (en)

Detergent compositions and process for preparing them

Title (de)

Waschmittelzusammensetzungen und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung

Title (fr)

Compositions détergentes et procédé pour leur préparation

Publication

EP 0351937 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 89304210 A

Priority

GB 8817386 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0351937A1] A granular detergent composition or component therefor having a bulk density of at least 650 g/litre is prepared by granulating a particulate material, preferably spray-dried, in a high-speed mixer/granulator having both a stirring action and a cutting action, in the absence of an agent for improving surface properties. The particulate starting material comprises (a) from 12 to 70 wt% of non-soap detergent-active material (preferably consisting at least partially of anionic detergent-active material) and (b) at least 15 wt% of water-soluble crystalline inorganic salts, including sodium tripolyphosphate and/or sodium carbonate, the weight ratio of (b) to (a) being at least 0.4:1.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 11/00; C11D 3/08; C11D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/06 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/60 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 11/04 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/128 (2013.01); C11D 11/04 (2013.01); C11D 17/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0351937 A1 19900124; EP 0351937 B1 19940209; EP 0351937 B2 20011212; AU 3375189 A 19900125; AU 611556 B2 19910613; BR 8902006 A 19900410; CA 1322704 C 19931005; DE 68912983 D1 19940324; DE 68912983 T2 19940601; DE 68912983 T3 20020404; ES 2049320 T3 19940416; ES 2049320 T5 20020516; GB 8817386 D0 19880824; GB 8910087 D0 19890621; HK 86594 A 19940902; IN 169824 B 19911228; IN 170472 B 19920328; JP 2644038 B2 19970825; JP H0241399 A 19900209; KR 920004462 B1 19920605; PH 26823 A 19921105; TR 25923 A 19930917; ZA 8903186 B 19901228; ZA 8905578 B 19910327

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20090426

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080427

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080428

2009-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080428

2009-05-20 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20090426

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080417

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080602

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-04-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-01-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-04-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040428

2003-04-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030422

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-04-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030403

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-05-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20020211

2002-05-03 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2002-04-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2002-02-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER N.V.

2001-01-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER N.V.

- Effective date: 19941107

1997-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1997-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER N.V.

1997-05-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER N.V.

- Effective date: 19941107

1997-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970430

1997-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970430

1996-04-02 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 19960402

- Year of fee payment: 8

1995-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER N.V.

1995-01-31 [EAL] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN

1994-12-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER N.V.

- Effective date: 19941107

1994-04-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1994-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2049320 T3

1994-03-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI CASETTA & PERANI S.P.A.

1994-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 68912983 19940324

1994-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1992-12-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: UNILEVER PLC

1992-12-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V.

1992-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19920901

1990-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19900226

1990-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE