Global Patent Index - EP 0367649 B2

EP 0367649 B2 2001-05-16 - Safety lock with disc tumblers

Title (en)

Safety lock with disc tumblers

Title (de)

Sicherheitsschloss mit Zuhaltungsscheiben

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrure haute sécurité à rondelles de codage

Publication

EP 0367649 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 89402846 A

Priority

FR 8813898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0367649A1] The lock device is of the type comprising a stationary shank fixedly receiving a bush (2) which itself fixedly receives an internal block (3) comprising a stack of shaped disc tumblers (30) firmly gripped between two end disc (31, 32) and capable of admitting the bits of a key as far as a stop, controlling the rotation of these bits and allowing them or not to pass through an exit slot (212) made in the end wall (21) of the bush (22) for the purpose of driving at least one bolt. The internal block (3) possesses, furthermore, an intermediate disc (34) located between the two end discs (31, 32) and having a passage (342) capable of allowing the bits of the key to have access as far as the said stop and to rotate. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB GR IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0367649 A1 19900509; EP 0367649 B1 19960214; EP 0367649 B2 20010516; DE 68925672 D1 19960328; FR 2638198 A1 19900427; FR 2638198 B1 19910104

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20091012

2009-11-04 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20091012

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-08 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2001-05-16 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB GR IT LU NL

1997-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ZAOUI CHARLES

- Effective date: 19961031

1997-01-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DENY

- Effective date: 19961108

1996-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Effective date: 19961031

1996-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19961031

1996-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

1996-06-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19960502

1996-05-15 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Effective date: 19960515

1996-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 68925672 19960328

1996-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB GR IT LU NL

1996-02-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 19960214

1996-02-14 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19960214

1996-02-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19960214

1996-02-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19960214

1995-05-24 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 0100 C.T.V. SARL

1994-09-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940803

1994-06-08 [19F] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER STAY OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 19940705

1993-02-24 [19A] STAY OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 19920212

1990-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19901102

1990-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB GR IT LU NL