Global Patent Index - EP 0370108 B2

EP 0370108 B2 2000-04-26 - LINING MATERIAL OF PIPELINE

Title (en)

LINING MATERIAL OF PIPELINE

Title (de)

AUSKLEIDUNGSMATERIAL FÜR EINE ROHRLEITUNG

Title (fr)

MATERIAU DE GARNISSAGE DE CONDUITES

Publication

EP 0370108 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 88908744 A

Priority

  • JP 25137587 A
  • JP 28664387 A
  • JP 8801015 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH01127328A] PURPOSE:To enable the title method to satisfy desired vibration-free properties, shape retention properties against external pressure and pressure resistance, by a method wherein a high- rigidity thread is tied to a cylindrical woven fabric at extremely rough density, a cylindrical member made of a fiber is formed by slackening the high-rigidity thread between tied points and an airtight layer of rubber or synthetic resin is formed on the other surface of the cylindrical woven fabric in the cylindrical member made of the fiber. CONSTITUTION:A cylindrical woven fabric 4 is woven with warp 5 and weft 6 (example: polyester yarn), a high-rigidity thread 7 (example: glass fiber) is arranged on the inside of the cylindrical woven fabric 4 and a cylindrical member 2 made of a fiber is woven by tying them together with a tying thread 8 at rough density. In this instance, the diameter of the cylindrical member 2 made of the fiber is woven so that the same becomes a little larger than the diameter to be required as a lining material 1, woven to the high-rigidity thread 7 under a state where tension necessary for a weaving operation has been applied to the same and woven into the high-rigidity thread 7 under a slackless state. Then when the cylindrical member 2 made of the fiber is pulled in a lengthwise direction, the weft 6 of the cylindrical woven fabric 4 is bent and shrunken in a diametral direction and the high- rigidity thread 7 becomes a slackened state. Then an airtight layer 3 is formed on the outside of the cylindrical member 2 made of the fiber through an extrusion molding method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B32B 5/02; B32B 5/26; B32B 1/08; B32B 27/12; B29C 63/36; F16L 57/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 63/36 (2006.01); B32B 1/08 (2006.01); B32B 5/08 (2006.01); B32B 5/26 (2006.01); B32B 25/10 (2006.01); B32B 27/10 (2006.01); B32B 27/12 (2006.01); D06M 15/55 (2006.01); F16L 55/165 (2006.01); D06M 101/00 (2006.01); D06M 101/16 (2006.01); D06M 101/30 (2006.01); D06M 101/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B32B 1/08 (2013.01); B32B 3/04 (2013.01); B32B 7/12 (2013.01); B32B 25/10 (2013.01); B32B 27/10 (2013.01); B32B 27/12 (2013.01); F16L 55/1656 (2013.01); B32B 2307/54 (2013.01); B32B 2307/7242 (2013.01); B32B 2597/00 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1362 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 8902821 A1 19890406; AU 2530788 A 19890418; AU 612200 B2 19910704; DE 3855537 D1 19961017; DE 3855537 T2 19970116; DE 3855537 T3 20001221; DK 166573 B1 19930614; DK 271489 A 19890602; DK 271489 D0 19890602; EP 0370108 A1 19900530; EP 0370108 A4 19900220; EP 0370108 B1 19960911; EP 0370108 B2 20000426; JP H01127328 A 19890519; JP H0692121 B2 19941116; US 5077107 A 19911231

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20081004

2009-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-12-01 [NLV7] NL: LAPSED DUE TO REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20081005

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20081005

2008-10-29 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20081004

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-09-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2000-07-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-07-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2000-06-16 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-04-26 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1997-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: NORDITUBE TECHNOLOGIES AB

1997-07-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: NORDITUBE TECHNOLOGIES AB

- Effective date: 19970610

1996-12-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Free text: CORRECTIONS

1996-11-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

1996-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 3855537 19961017

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1992-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19920504

1990-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19890922

1990-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL