Global patent index - EP 0370185 B2

EP 0370185 B2 2000-01-19 - Process for smoothing a paper or cardboard web

Title (en)

Process for smoothing a paper or cardboard web

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Glätten einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé de lissage d'une rande de papier ou de carton

Publication

EP 0370185 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 89116409 A

Priority

CH 404588 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0370185A1] The smoothing takes place in a smoothing zone (2), in which the operation is carried out under pressure using temperature and moisture. The desired smoothness is achieved with a correspondingly long residence time of the web of material (1) in a smoothing zone (2) which is correspondingly long having regard to the velocity of the web. A still moist web (1) is guided between heatable surfaces (3, 4) which are arranged on both sides of the web (1), face each other across the web, extend in parallel and can each be pressed against the web. The surfaces (3, 4) are constructed over their entire length for forming and holding a given, defined contour of smoothing zone (2). The one surface (3) is, for example, constructed as an outer surface (5) of a heated cylinder (6) and the second surface (4) is constructed as a continuous flexible belt (7) which can be pressed towards the outer surface (5) of the cylinder by means of a concave support element (8). …<??>If desired, the web (1) can be smoothed on both sides using the method. …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0370185 A1 19900530; EP 0370185 B1 19920513; EP 0370185 B2 20000119; DE 3920204 A1 19900510; DE 3920204 C2 19910411; US 5163364 A 19921117

INPADOC legal status

2005-05-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040907

2004-09-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040906

2003-09-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-09-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-08-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030818

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-02-23 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-01-19 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT GB SE

1995-01-31 [EAL] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN

- Ref Legal Event Code: EAL

1993-03-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: J.M. VOITH GMBH

- Effective date: 19930129

1993-03-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: EDUARD KUESTERS MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 19930208

1992-09-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

1992-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT GB SE

1992-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 76134

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 1992-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1991-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19911008

1990-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19890906

1990-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT GB SE