Global Patent Index - EP 0376823 B2

EP 0376823 B2 2001-04-11 - Process and device for the flow rate control of liquid CO2, and their use in a cooling tunnel

Title (en)

Process and device for the flow rate control of liquid CO2, and their use in a cooling tunnel

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Mengenstromregelung von flüssigen CO2 und deren Anwendung für einen Kühltunnel

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de régulation d'un débit de CO2 liquide, et application à un tunnel de refroidissement

Publication

EP 0376823 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 89403619 A

Priority

FR 8817305 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5040374A] According to the process, there is maintained in a conduit (3), on the downstream side of a valve (5), up to the vicinity of the point A of injection of the CO2, an intermediate pressure (PI) higher than the pressure (PT) of the triple point of the CO2. Application in the treatment of waste waters or the deep freezing of food.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 7/02; F17C 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/08 (2006.01); B01F 5/04 (2006.01); F17C 7/02 (2006.01); F17C 13/10 (2006.01); F25D 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/0413 (2013.01); B01F 3/0865 (2013.01); B01F 3/088 (2013.01); F17C 7/02 (2013.01); F17C 13/10 (2013.01); F25D 29/001 (2013.01); B01F 2003/04893 (2013.01); B01F 2003/0888 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0335 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0338 (2013.01); F17C 2221/013 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0153 (2013.01); F17C 2223/035 (2013.01); F17C 2225/0123 (2013.01); F17C 2225/033 (2013.01); F17C 2227/0114 (2013.01); F17C 2250/0636 (2013.01); F17C 2260/024 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0376823 A1 19900704; EP 0376823 B1 19940126; EP 0376823 B2 20010411; AU 4732889 A 19900705; AU 629584 B2 19921008; CA 2006789 A1 19900628; CA 2006789 C 19941025; DE 68912755 D1 19940310; DE 68912755 T2 19940511; DE 68912755 T3 20010802; ES 2048312 T3 19940316; ES 2048312 T5 20010516; FR 2641854 A1 19900720; FR 2641854 B1 19940114; US 5040374 A 19910820

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051222

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20021223

2003-10-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-07-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. L'*AIR LIQUIDE POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION

- Effective date: 20021231

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CARBOXYQUE FRANCAISE

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-12-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021223

2001-12-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-11-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-11-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-11-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011120

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-11-16 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20011116

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-11-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011112

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-06-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2001-06-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2001-06-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2001-05-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20010420

2001-05-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2001-04-11 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-12-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20001211

- Year of fee payment: 12

1995-08-31 [REG GR MM2A] ANNULMENT OR LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Free text: 3010563

1995-02-16 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: GCT GASE-UND CRYO-TECHNIK GMBH

1995-01-31 [EAL] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN

1994-12-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19941222

1994-12-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GCT GASE- UND CRYO-TECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 19941026

1994-08-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 19940126

1994-03-31 [REG GR FG4A] VALIDATION IN GREECE

- Free text: 3010563

1994-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2048312 T3

1994-03-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 68912755 19940310

1994-02-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

1994-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1994-01-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Effective date: 19940126

1994-01-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Effective date: 19940126

1994-01-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19940126

1994-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 100921 T 19940215

1992-03-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19920124

1990-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19891228

1990-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE