Global patent index - EP 0387395 B2

EP 0387395 B2 2001-01-03 - Stabilized polyurethane modified polyester forming fabric

Title (en)

Stabilized polyurethane modified polyester forming fabric

Title (de)

Stabilisiertes Papiermaschinengewebe aus mit Polyurethan modifiziertem Polyester

Title (fr)

Toile stabilisée pour machine de fabrication de papier en polyester modifié avec le polyuréthane

Publication

EP 0387395 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 89115192 A

Priority

US 32461489 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0387395A2] This invention discloses a paper-maker's forming fabric wherein some of the yarns are melt-extruded monofilaments, that are a blend of 60 to 90% by weight of a polyethylene terephthalate, together with 40 to 10% by weight of a thermoplastic polyurethane, which may be an ester or ether-based type. Additionally, it is contemplated that the blend may contain up to 5% by weight of a hydrolysis stabilizer. The high abrasion resistance of these blended monofilaments makes them particularly advantageous for use in replacing the nylon-6 and nylon-66 monofilaments currently used in paper machine forming fabrics. The monofilaments disclosed comprising blends of polyethylene terephthalate and thermoplastic polyurethane are also a feature of this invention.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/00; D01F 6/92

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/92 (2006.01); D21F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/92 (2013.01); D21F 1/0027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0387395 A2 19900919; EP 0387395 A3 19910925; EP 0387395 B1 19941207; EP 0387395 B2 20010103; AT 115211 T 19941215; DE 68919827 D1 19950119; DE 68919827 T2 19950427; DE 68919827 T3 20010517; ES 2064400 T3 19950201; ES 2064400 T5 20010301

INPADOC legal status

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080702

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20110616

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20090818

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20090816

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20090817

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090818

2009-10-13 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2009-10-01 [NLV7] NL: LAPSED DUE TO REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV7

- Effective date: 20090817

2009-09-09 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20090816

2009-08-31 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *JWI LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BE20

- Effective date: 20090817

2009-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080701

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080814

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080704

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080819

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080707

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080831

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-02-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2005-08-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050817

2004-02-27 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ASTENJOHNSON, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-11 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2001-05-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2001-03-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-03-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Effective date: 20010123

2001-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

2001-01-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2001-01-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1996-01-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: HOECHST TREVIRA GMBH & CO KG

1995-11-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: HOECHST TREVIRA GMBH & CO KG

- Effective date: 19950906

1995-02-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1995-02-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1995-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2064400

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

1995-01-31 [EAL] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN

- Ref Legal Event Code: EAL

1995-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 68919827

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1995-01-19

1994-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1994-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 115211

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 1994-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1993-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19930702

1992-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19920113

1991-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1990-10-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1990-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE