Global Patent Index - EP 0391096 B2

EP 0391096 B2 2000-01-19 - Method for automatically controlling the crusher clearance, determining the granular size, of a crushing machine and apparatus for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method for automatically controlling the crusher clearance, determining the granular size, of a crushing machine and apparatus for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum automatischen Einstellen des den Kornaufbau deszerkleinerten Gutes bestimmenden Mahlspaltes einer Zerkleinerungsmachine und Anlage hierfür

Title (fr)

Procédé de réglage automatique de la fente de broyage, déterminant la granulométrie, d'une machine de broyage et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 0391096 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 90104795 A

Priority

DE 3911271 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0391096A2] The invention relates to a method for automatically controlling the crusher clearance, determining the granular size, of a crushing machine which has a first circulating crushing tool 2-4 and at least one further crushing tool 5,7 assigned to the latter. The invention relates in particular to a method for operating an impact mill in which, in order to avoid substantial changes to the granular size of the crushed material, the impact mechanism 5,7 is moved when the impact mill is idling by means of a drive 10,11 up to the first contact with the impact strips 4 on the rotor 2 and, after identifying the resulting noises by means of a microphone 18, the movement is reversed until the previously specified crusher clearance is reached. According to the invention, a filter circuit is provided which makes the noises resulting from the contact of the crushing tools 4,5,7 recognisable for a computer which permits the steps necessary for the control to proceed according to a predetermined programme. The invention also relates to a system for carrying out the method. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 13/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/095 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0391096 A2 19901010; EP 0391096 A3 19910814; EP 0391096 B1 19931215; EP 0391096 B2 20000119; BR 9001631 A 19910507; CA 2014021 A1 19901007; CA 2014021 C 20010123; DE 3911271 A1 19901011; ES 2049359 T3 19940416; ES 2049359 T5 20000401; JP 2928327 B2 19990803; JP H02293058 A 19901204; MX 173058 B 19940131; ZA 9002579 B 19910424

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050314

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-04-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-03-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030312

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-03-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030312

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-11-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-03-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-03-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2001-05-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010528

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-03-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010321

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-03-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010302

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-01-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2000-11-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2000-09-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NOELL SERVICE UND MASCHINENTECHNIK GMBH TRANSFER-

2000-05-26 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-04-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000308

- Year of fee payment: 11

2000-02-16 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2000-01-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-01-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-01-19 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1994-09-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KRUPP FOERDERTECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 19940730

1994-04-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1994-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2049359 T3

1994-04-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19940304

1994-02-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1994-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59003828 19940127

1993-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1993-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 98524 T 19940115

1993-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOELL SERVICE UND MASCHINENTECHNIK GMBH

1993-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MSG MASCHINEN-SERVICE GMBH

1993-06-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MSG MASCHINEN-SERVICE GMBH

1993-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19930426

1992-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920118

1991-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1990-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI