Global Patent Index - EP 0396646 B2

EP 0396646 B2 2001-01-03 - MELT-SPINNING DEVICE WITH HIGH WINDING-OFF SPEEDS

Title (en)

MELT-SPINNING DEVICE WITH HIGH WINDING-OFF SPEEDS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHMELZSPINNEN MIT HOHEN ABZUGSGESCHWINDIGKEITEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FILATURE A CHAUD AVEC DES VITESSES DE DEVIDEMENT ELEVEES

Publication

EP 0396646 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 89908959 A

Priority

  • CH 314688 A
  • CH 8900147 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9002222A1] A melt-spinning device comprises an essentially sealed spinning chamber (3) mounted in a gas-tight manner between a spinneret bundle (2) and a yarn suction device (7). The spinning chamber (3) is partially perforated only in the region located 150 to 350 mm from the spinneret bundle. At a winding-off speed of 5500 m/min, the filament produced has a count irregularity less than 0.60 % U.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 5/092; D01D 5/098

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/62 (2006.01); D01D 5/092 (2006.01); D01D 5/098 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/098 (2013.01); D01D 5/092 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9002222 A1 19900308; BR 8907063 A 19910102; DE 58906504 D1 19940203; EP 0396646 A1 19901114; EP 0396646 B1 19931222; EP 0396646 B2 20010103; JP 2535880 Y2 19970514; JP H03500908 A 19910228; JP H081665 U 19961217

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050814

2001-06-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010301

2001-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-04-12 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-04-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20000814

2001-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2001-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010301

2001-01-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2001-01-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-09-20 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MELT-SPINNING DEVICE WITH HIGH WINDING-OFF SPEEDS

2000-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-07-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HOECHST AG

2000-05-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HOECHST AG

- Effective date: 19940922

1999-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 19990830

- Year of fee payment: 11

1999-08-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 19990816

- Year of fee payment: 11

1999-08-11 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 19990811

- Year of fee payment: 11

1999-08-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 19990811

- Year of fee payment: 11

1999-08-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 19990802

- Year of fee payment: 11

1996-04-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: RHONE-POULENC VISCOSUISSE SA

1996-01-31 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RHONE-POULENC VISCOSUISSE SA

1995-01-16 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HOECHST AG

1994-11-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HOECHST AG

- Effective date: 19940922

1994-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19940217

1994-03-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

1994-03-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1994-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 58906504 19940203

1993-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1993-12-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19931222

1992-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19920318

1991-01-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHONE-POULENC VISCOSUISSE SA

1990-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19900903

1990-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL