Global patent index - EP 0399540 B2

EP 0399540 B2 2000-07-05 - Method and device for wrapping products in a hood of stretchable film and packaging unit shaped with this

Title (en)

Method and device for wrapping products in a hood of stretchable film and packaging unit shaped with this

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Umhüllen von Stückgut mit einer Stretchfolienhaube und hiermit zu bildende Verpackungseinheit

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour envelopper des marchandises avec une housse de film étirable et ensemble d'emballage formé avec ceux-ci

Publication

EP 0399540 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 90109925 A

Priority

DE 3917110 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0399540A1] The invention relates to a method for wrapping products (2) - in particular stacked product parts such as, and in particular, substantially parallelipipedic or cubic product stacks consisting of a plurality of superposed and substantially flush layers of product - by means of a tubular section (1) of stretchable film whose original circumference is less than the circumference of the product (2) to be wrapped which, before being drawn over the product, is stretched in its circumferential direction to an extent which makes it possible to draw it effortlessly over the product, and which, after being drawn over, rests closely on the product with the expansion being retained, the section of stretchable film being sealed off at one of its ends, with the formation of a welded joint (13), to form a hood (1') of (stretchable) film, the weld extending, after wrapping, substantially centrally and parallel to two mutually opposite edges of the end faces (17) of the product, the length L of the welded joint being at least about 85 to 90% of the length of the edges of the end faces of the product stack which, in the wrapped state, are parallel to the said weld, and a device for carrying out the abovementioned method and a packaging unit to be formed by means of the abovementioned method and/or of the abovementioned device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/13 (2006.01); B65B 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/135 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0399540 A1 19901128; EP 0399540 B1 19931208; EP 0399540 B2 20000705; AT 98178 T 19931215; DE 3917110 A1 19901129; DE 3917110 C2 19930715; DE 59003755 C5 20061012; DE 59003755 D1 19940120; DK 0399540 T3 19940214; DK 0399540 T4 20000904

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100525

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100525

2010-06-14 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

2010-05-31 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: BERNHARD *BEUMER MASCHINENFABRIK K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BE20

- Effective date: 20100525

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-05-26 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20100525

2009-11-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BEUMER MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2009-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090531

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-05-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-03-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: BEUMER MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, KAMINSKI & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE ESTABLI

2001-12-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Free Format Text: BERNHARD BEUMER MASCHINENFABRIK KG TRANSFER- BEUMER MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG

2000-12-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2000-09-04 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T4

2000-09-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

2000-08-11 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2000-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: MASCHINENFABRIK MOELLERS GMBH U. CO.

2000-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: MSK-VERPACKUNGS-SYSTEME GMBH

2000-07-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-07-05 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR LI LU NL

2000-05-31 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: MASCHINENFABRIK MOELLERS GMBH U. CO. * 19940827 MS

- Effective date: 19940720

1998-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: KURT LACHENMEIER A/S KL INDUSTRIMASKINER

1998-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: MASCHINENFABRIK MOELLERS GMBH U. CO.

1998-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: MSK-VERPACKUNGS-SYSTEME GMBH

1998-04-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: KURT LACHENMEIER A/S KL INDUSTRIMASKINER * 940720

- Effective date: 19940510

1994-12-16 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: MSK - VERPACKUNGS - SYSTEME GMBH

1994-11-16 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: MASCHINENFABRIK MOELLERS GMBH U. CO.

1994-10-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: KURT LACHENMEIER A/S KL INDUSTRIMASKINER

- Effective date: 19940510

1994-10-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: MASCHINENFABRIK MOELLERS GMBH U. CO.

- Effective date: 19940720

1994-10-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: MSK-VERPACKUNGS-SYSTEME GMBH

- Effective date: 19940827

1994-10-03 [EPTA] LU: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EPTA

1994-09-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: KURT LACHENMEIER A/S KL INDUSTRIMASKINER

- Effective date: 19940510

1994-09-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: MASCHINENFABRIK MOELLERS GMBH U. CO.

- Effective date: 19940720

1994-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: KURT LACHENMEIER A/S KL INDUSTRIMASKINER

1994-07-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: KURT LACHENMEIER A/S KL INDUSTRIMASKINER

- Effective date: 19940510

1994-02-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

1994-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59003755

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1994-01-20

1994-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1993-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR LI LU NL

1993-12-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 98178

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 1993-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1993-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19930226

1990-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19901019

1990-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR LI LU NL