Global Patent Index - EP 0400791 B9

EP 0400791 B9 2002-11-27 - Electronic device manufacture involving a pattern delineation step

Title (en)

Electronic device manufacture involving a pattern delineation step

Title (de)

Herstellung eines elektronischen Bauteiles unter Verwendung eines Schrittes zur Strukturerzeugung

Title (fr)

Fabrication de composant électronique incluant une étape de délinéation d'un motif

Publication

EP 0400791 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 90303768 A

Priority

  • US 33562689 A
  • US 44457989 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0400791A2] Fine featured devices are produced by a series of fabrication steps including exposing selective surface regions to irradiation, e.g. to an ion beam, generally to result in removal of masking material within irradiated regions. In most instances, subsequent etching is under conditions such that bared material is preferentially removed. Etch-removal and irradiation are such that overgrown material is of device quality at least in etched regions. The inventive process is of particular value in the fabrication of integrated circuits, e.g. circuits performing electronic and/or optical functions. The inventive process is expediently used in the fabrication of structures having minimum feature size of 1 micrometer and smaller. Patterning is dependent upon masking material of a maximum thickness of 100 ANGSTROM .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/20; H01L 21/308; H01L 21/311

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/302 (2006.01); H01L 21/20 (2006.01); H01L 21/304 (2006.01); H01L 21/306 (2006.01); H01L 21/308 (2006.01); H01L 21/311 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/3086 (2013.01); H01L 21/02381 (2013.01); H01L 21/02392 (2013.01); H01L 21/02395 (2013.01); H01L 21/02461 (2013.01); H01L 21/02463 (2013.01); H01L 21/02507 (2013.01); H01L 21/02543 (2013.01); H01L 21/02546 (2013.01); H01L 21/02631 (2013.01); H01L 21/30621 (2013.01); H01L 21/3081 (2013.01); H01L 21/31116 (2013.01); H01L 21/31144 (2013.01); Y10S 148/026 (2013.01); Y10S 148/111 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0400791 A2 19901205; EP 0400791 A3 19910102; EP 0400791 B1 20011219; EP 0400791 B9 20021127; CA 2014285 A1 19901010; CA 2014285 C 19940607; DE 69033879 D1 20020131; DE 69033879 T2 20020822; JP H02295115 A 19901206; JP H0722142 B2 19950308; KR 940007443 B1 19940818; US 5106764 A 19920421

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-12 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1006375

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020409

2002-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020409

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69033879 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2001-12-19 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

1994-06-22 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: AT&T CORP.

1993-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19930809

1991-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19910619

1991-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1990-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL