Global Patent Index - EP 0401685 B2

EP 0401685 B2 2000-03-08 - Multi-roll cluster rolling apparatus

Title (en)

Multi-roll cluster rolling apparatus

Title (de)

Vielwalzengerüst

Title (fr)

Cage de laminoir à rouleaux multiples

Publication

EP 0401685 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 90110360 A

Priority

  • JP 14105789 A
  • JP 14105889 A
  • JP 14105989 A
  • JP 14795889 A
  • JP 14795989 A
  • JP 14796089 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0401685A1] A multi-roll cluster rolling apparatus has a pair of work rolls (2), and a plurality of first intermediate rolls (3), a plurality of second intermediate rolls (4) and a plurality of backup rolls (5) arranged successively in the mentioned order behind each the work roll. A roll crown presented by unidirectinally tapering one end of a roll is imparted to at least a pair of rolls. e.g., the work rolls, selected from a roll group consisting of the work rolls, first intermediate rolls and the second intermediate rolls. A roll crown approximated by at least one-pitch portion of a waveform is imparted to at least one other pair of rolls, e.g., pairs of the first intermediate rolls. A roll crown approximated by at least two-pitch portion of a waveform is imparted to at least one of the remainder pairs of rolls, e.g.,selected pairs of the second intermediate rolls. The rolls of each pair having the same roll crown arranged arranged in opposite axial directions and are axially shiftably (6) mounted on a mill housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 13/142 (2013.01); B21B 13/147 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0401685 A1 19901212; EP 0401685 B1 19940525; EP 0401685 B2 20000308; AU 604620 B1 19901220; CA 2018261 A1 19901205; CA 2018261 C 19941115; DE 69009102 D1 19940630; DE 69009102 T2 19940929; DE 69009102 T3 20010208; FI 902759 A0 19900604; KR 930006110 B1 19930707; NO 178254 B 19951113; NO 178254 C 19960221; NO 902458 A 19901206; NO 902458 D0 19900601

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-03 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20020603

- Year of fee payment: 3

2002-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2000-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20000529

- Year of fee payment: 11

2000-05-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2000-05-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000510

- Year of fee payment: 11

2000-04-28 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-03-08 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1995-04-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AG

- Effective date: 19950224

1994-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1994-06-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69009102 19940630

1994-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1994-01-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1992-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19920403

1991-02-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION

1990-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19900627

1990-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE