Global Patent Index - EP 0406433 B9

EP 0406433 B9 2007-10-10 - TETRAFLUOROETHANE COMPOSITION FOR A REGRIGERATOR

Title (en)

TETRAFLUOROETHANE COMPOSITION FOR A REGRIGERATOR

Title (de)

TETRAFLUORÄTHANGEMISCH FÜR EINEN KÜHLSCHRANK

Title (fr)

COMPOSE A BASE DE TETRAFLUOROETHANE POUR REFRIGERATEURS

Publication

EP 0406433 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 89912503 A

Priority

  • JP 8901150 W
  • JP 21755189 A
  • JP 21755089 A
  • JP 18452889 A
  • JP 8982589 A
  • JP 134589 A
  • JP 134489 A
  • JP 26289 A
  • JP 26189 A
  • JP 26089 A
  • JP 28401188 A
  • JP 28401088 A
  • JP 28400988 A
  • JP 28400888 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9005172A1] A tetrafluoroethane composition for a refrigerator, which comprises a tetrafluoroethane and at least one polyether selected from the group consisting of: (I), (II) and (III), wherein R<1> is an alkylene group, each of R<2>, R<3>, R<4>, R<5>, R<6>, R<7> and R<8> which may be the same or different is a hydrogen atom, and alkyl group, an aralkyl group, an aryl group, an acyl group, a glycidyl group, -SO2R<9>, alpha , beta or -Y<1>-(OR<1>)p-OR<12>, wherein R<1> is as defined above, each of R<9>, R<10> R<11> and R<12> is an alkyl group, an aralkyl group or an aryl, and Y<1> is a residue of a dicarboxylic compound having at least 3 carbon atoms, provided that at least one of R<2> and R<3> and at least one of R<4> and R<5> are not hydrogen atoms, and when R<2> is a hydrogen atom, an alkyl group for R<3> has 1 or 2 carbon atoms, and when R<3> is a hydrogen atom, an alkyl group for R<2> has 1 or 2 carbon atoms, l, m, n and p which may be the same or different are integers which bring the kinematic viscosity of the compounds of the formulas (I) to (III) to a level of from 5 to 300 cSt at 40 DEG C, X<1> is a residue obtained by removing hydroxyl groups from a dihydroxy compound or a dicarboxylic compound, and X<2> is a residue obtained by removing hydroxyl groups from a trihydroxy compound or a tricarboxylic compound.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 5/04 (2006.01); C07C 43/02 (2006.01); C10M 171/00 (2006.01); F25D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 171/008 (2013.01); C09K 5/045 (2013.01); C09K 2205/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9005172 A1 19900517; AU 4508789 A 19900528; AU 616073 B2 19911017; CA 2002693 A1 19900511; CA 2002693 C 20040330; DE 68927858 D1 19970417; DE 68927858 T2 19970626; DE 68927858 T3 20070503; EP 0406433 A1 19910109; EP 0406433 B1 19970312; EP 0406433 B2 20070103; EP 0406433 B9 20071010; KR 960007698 B1 19960608

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20091108

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20091109

2010-01-04 [NLV7] NL: LAPSED DUE TO REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20091109

2009-12-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20091108

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081105

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081112

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081107

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081107

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081103

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-08-10 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2007-04-03 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2007-04-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2007-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-04-07 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

1998-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: NIPPON OIL CO. LTD.

1998-02-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: NIPPON OIL CO. LTD.

- Effective date: 19971212

1997-06-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1997-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 68927858 19970417

1997-03-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: 0403;12MIFING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1993-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19930518

1991-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19900711

1991-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE