Global Patent Index - EP 0406479 B2

EP 0406479 B2 2002-09-04 - Refrigeration lubricants

Title (en)

Refrigeration lubricants

Title (de)

Kältemaschinenschmiermittel

Title (fr)

Lubrifiants pour la réfrigération

Publication

EP 0406479 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 89119265 A

Priority

  • JP 17200089 A
  • JP 17200189 A
  • JP 17200289 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0406479A1] A lubricant for hydrofluorocarbon refrigerant comprises as a main component an ester obtained by esterifying at least one straight or branched-chain monovalent fatty acid having a particular carbon number with neopentyl glycol or at least one compound of general formula (I) or a polyvalent alcohol of general formula (II) or further at least one polybasic acid having a particular carbon number: <CHEM> This lubricant has a sufficient compatibility with the hydrofluorocarbon refrigerant used as a refrigerant instead of the conventional chlorine-containing compounds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 105/38; C10M 105/40; C10M 105/42; C10M 105/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 105/00 (2006.01); C10M 105/32 (2006.01); C10M 105/38 (2006.01); C10M 105/40 (2006.01); C10M 105/42 (2006.01); C10M 105/44 (2006.01); C10M 171/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 105/32 (2013.01); C10M 105/00 (2013.01); C10M 105/38 (2013.01); C10M 105/40 (2013.01); C10M 105/42 (2013.01); C10M 105/44 (2013.01); C10M 105/52 (2013.01); C10M 171/008 (2013.01); C10M 2203/003 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2805 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2835 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2875 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2885 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2895 (2013.01); C10M 2207/301 (2013.01); C10M 2207/302 (2013.01); C10M 2207/3025 (2013.01); C10M 2207/345 (2013.01); C10M 2209/109 (2013.01); C10M 2209/11 (2013.01); C10M 2211/0206 (2013.01); C10M 2211/022 (2013.01); C10M 2211/0225 (2013.01); C10M 2211/0245 (2013.01); C10M 2211/06 (2013.01); C10N 2240/00 (2013.01); C10N 2240/22 (2013.01); C10N 2240/30 (2013.01); C10N 2240/50 (2013.01); C10N 2240/52 (2013.01); C10N 2240/54 (2013.01); C10N 2240/56 (2013.01); C10N 2240/58 (2013.01); C10N 2240/60 (2013.01); C10N 2240/66 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0406479 A1 19910109; EP 0406479 B1 19940406; EP 0406479 B2 20020904; DE 68914448 D1 19940511; DE 68914448 T2 19940825; DE 68914448 T3 20030306; DE 68925537 D1 19960307; DE 68925537 T2 19960704; DE 68927916 D1 19970430; DE 68927916 T2 19970821; DE 68927916 T3 20050310; DE 68928281 D1 19971002; DE 68928281 T2 19980115; EP 0479338 A2 19920408; EP 0479338 A3 19920527; EP 0479338 B1 19970827; EP 0480479 A2 19920415; EP 0480479 A3 19920617; EP 0480479 B1 19970326; EP 0480479 B2 20040901; EP 0536814 A1 19930414; EP 0536814 B1 19960124; ES 2051340 T3 19940616; ES 2051340 T5 20030316; ES 2082341 T3 19960316; ES 2099120 T3 19970516; ES 2099120 T5 20050316; ES 2104650 T3 19971016; KR 950005694 B1 19950529; SG 49157 A1 19980518; SG 49165 A1 19980518

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20091016

2009-11-11 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20091016

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081015

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051018

2006-06-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-10-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051018

2005-10-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051018

2004-11-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041116

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-10-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041006

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-03-28 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2003-03-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2002-09-04 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-09-04 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: TEILANMELDUNG 91121100.1 EINGEREICHT AM 17/10/89.

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

1999-12-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RWE- DEA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT FUER MINERALOEL UND CH

- Effective date: 19941229

1996-08-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RWE- DEA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT FUER MINERALOEL UND CH

- Effective date: 19941229

1996-04-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RWE- DEA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT FUER MINERALOEL UND CH

- Effective date: 19941229

1995-06-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: JAPAN ENERGY CORPORATION

1995-03-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RWE- DEA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT FUER MINERALOEL UND CH

- Effective date: 19941229

1995-03-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MOBIL OIL CORPORATION

- Effective date: 19950105

1995-03-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE LUBRIZOL CORPORATION

- Effective date: 19950109

1995-03-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC

- Effective date: 19950105

1995-02-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RWE- DEA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT FUER MINERALOEL UND CH

- Effective date: 19941229

1995-02-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: JAPAN ENERGY CORPORATION

1995-01-31 [EAL] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN

1995-01-09 [ITPR] IT: CHANGES IN OWNERSHIP OF A EUROPEAN PATENT

- Owner name: CESSIONE;JAPAN ENERGY CORPORATION

1994-12-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

1994-10-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

1994-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1994-06-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.R.L.

1994-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 68914448 19940511

1994-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1994-04-06 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: TEILANMELDUNG 91121100.1 EINGEREICHT AM 17/10/89.

1991-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19910528

1991-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19901220

1991-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE