Global Patent Index - EP 0408812 B1

EP 0408812 B1 2000-03-01 - Distributed object based systems

Title (en)

Distributed object based systems

Title (de)

Verteilte auf Objekte basierende Systeme

Title (fr)

Systèmes distribués basés sur les objects

Publication

EP 0408812 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 89307458 A

Priority

EP 89307458 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0408812A1] An object based data processing system comprising a plurality of storage domains arranged so that a semantic object in a second storage domain can be accessed by the user of a first storage domain by the creation of a new presentation object in the first storage domain which is linked to the semantic object in the second storage domain.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/46; G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/44 (2006.01); G06F 9/46 (2006.01); G06F 15/16 (2006.01); G06F 17/21 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30607 (2013.01); G06F 9/465 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0953900 A2 19991103; EP 0953900 A3 20000524; DE 68929162 D1 20000406; DE 68929162 T2 20001116; EP 0408812 A1 19910123; EP 0408812 B1 20000301; JP 3062223 B2 20000710; JP H0358134 A 19910313; US 5410688 A 19950425

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050713

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060721

2006-07-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060721

2005-07-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050718

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-07-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050713

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2002-07-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020730

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 68929162 20000406

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 9/46 A, 7G 06F 17/30 B

1993-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19931104

1991-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19910610

1991-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB