Global Patent Index - EP 0412448 B1

EP 0412448 B1 2000-10-11 - Drafting arrangement with meshed control

Title (en)

Drafting arrangement with meshed control

Title (de)

Streckwerk mit vermaschter Regelung

Title (fr)

Système d'étirage avec commande maillée

Publication

EP 0412448 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 90114936 A

Priority

CH 295589 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0412448A1] The drafting arrangement has a main control (9.a, 9.b, 10.a, 10.b) and at least one auxiliary control (8.a, 8.b, 8.c, 8.d) for the drive groups (7.1, 7.2) of the drafting machine. The drafting machine has an inlet and an outlet measuring member (9.1, 9.2) which supply measurement signals for a central computer unit. By means of a family of characteristics (R) and by the use of the outlet measuring signal (Aout), a signal (me) representing the inlet slither cross-section (mE) is determined. The family of characteristics is adapted continuously during operation. Allowance for short-term irregularities of the entering slither is controlled by means of a threshold switch (25). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 5/42; D01G 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/40 (2006.01); D01G 23/06 (2006.01); D01H 5/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/42 (2013.01); D01G 23/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0412448 A1 19910213; EP 0412448 B1 20001011; DE 59010914 D1 20001116; JP 3037376 B2 20000424; JP H03180524 A 19910806; US 5134755 A 19920804

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070803

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-08-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060816

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-08-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060815

- Year of fee payment: 17

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20001011

2001-03-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-11-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59010914 20001116

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-10-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

1999-07-02 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980911

1991-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19910117

1991-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI