Global Patent Index - EP 0414917 B2

EP 0414917 B2 2001-01-03 - NONWOVEN FABRIC, PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR

Title (en)

NONWOVEN FABRIC, PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR

Title (de)

NICHTGEWOBENES GEWEBE, DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND VORRICHTUNG DAZU

Title (fr)

TISSU NON TISSE, PRODUCTION DE CE TISSU, ET INSTALLATION RELATIVE

Publication

EP 0414917 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 90904418 A

Priority

  • JP 9000318 W
  • JP 5838489 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0414917A1] A nonwoven fabric of the invention is characterized by comprising a filament layer wherein numerous filaments formed of a polymer material are spirally arranged as if numerous slender ellipses are arranged on a plane one beside another. It is produced by spinning a polymer material into filaments, vibrating the filaments, amplifying the vibration, and arranging the filaments in the form of an assembly of slender ellipses substantially in the direction of the major axis of the ellipse.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 3/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 3/05 (2006.01); D04H 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 3/16 (2013.01); D04H 3/03 (2013.01); D04H 3/05 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0414917 A1 19910306; EP 0414917 A4 19910911; EP 0414917 B1 19960228; EP 0414917 B2 20010103; CA 2028853 A1 19900911; CA 2028853 C 19990601; DE 69025517 D1 19960404; DE 69025517 T2 19960801; DE 69025517 T3 20010809; JP H02242960 A 19900927; JP H076126 B2 19950130; WO 9010743 A1 19900920

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080312

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080312

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080312

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070308

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-03-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070308

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-03-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070307

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MAROSCIA & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-02-23 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-01-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-01-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: COROVIN GMBH

- Effective date: 19961128

1996-05-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. DORIGUZZI ANDREA

1996-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69025517 19960404

1996-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-01-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS COMPANY, LIMITED

1996-01-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: POLYMER PROCESSING RESEARCH INSTITUTE LIMITED

1993-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19930903

1991-09-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19910723

1991-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1991-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19910228

1991-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT