Global Patent Index - EP 0417465 B2

EP 0417465 B2 2001-12-05 - Offset rotary printing machine with noise-protecting device

Title (en)

Offset rotary printing machine with noise-protecting device

Title (de)

Offset-rotationsdruckmaschine mit Schallschutzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Machine rotative d'impression avec dispositif de protection contre le bruit

Publication

EP 0417465 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 90115060 A

Priority

DE 3930364 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2023196A1] SUMMARY The invention relates to a protective device for offset rotary printing machines, in particular for printing units of sheet-fed rotary printing machines, with a sheet-like protective covering of the danger points, which is designed in such a way that sound protection for the printing units is achieved without adversely affecting easy accessibility for setting and service purposes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/42 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/42 (2013.01); B41F 33/0018 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0417465 A2 19910320; EP 0417465 A3 19910710; EP 0417465 B1 19950719; EP 0417465 B2 20011205; AT 125203 T 19950815; AU 6090690 A 19910321; AU 635059 B2 19930311; CA 2023196 A1 19910313; CN 1050158 A 19910327; DE 3930364 A1 19910321; JP 2600064 Y2 19990927; JP H03106650 A 19910507; JP H08687 U 19960423; US 5178069 A 19930112

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2007-09-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070904

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050806

2005-08-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050810

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-08-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050806

2004-07-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040726

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-05-17 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2002-03-27 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-04-12 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000806

2000-01-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20000117

- Year of fee payment: 10

1999-08-17 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 19990817

- Year of fee payment: 10

1996-06-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 19960416

1996-06-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KBA KOENIG & BAUER-ALBERT AG WERK WUERZBURG

- Effective date: 19960419

1995-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19951016

1995-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1995-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59009412 19950824

1995-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

1995-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 125203 T 19950815

1993-09-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

1993-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19930225

1991-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1991-06-05 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1991-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19900806

1991-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE