Global Patent Index - EP 0419377 B2

EP 0419377 B2 2001-04-18 - Procedure apparatus and paint for the laser marking of castings for electrical apparatus

Title (en)

Procedure apparatus and paint for the laser marking of castings for electrical apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren, Vorrichtung und Farbstoff für Laserbeschriftung von Umhüllungen für elektrische Geräte

Title (fr)

Procédé, dispositif et peinture de marquage laser pour boitiers moulés d'appareils électriques

Publication

EP 0419377 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 90420405 A

Priority

  • FR 8912557 A
  • FR 8915853 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0419377A1] The marking of a product, particularly of a moulded casing for an electronic apparatus, is carried out at the end of a manufacturing or assembly line (10) by a writing of variable data using a laser beam. The marking zone is previously coated with a layer of paint which is reactive to the laser and has a percentage of pigmentation allowing writing and contrast of good quality. The pigments may be mineral or organic. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/267 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0419377 A1 19910327; EP 0419377 B1 19960306; EP 0419377 B2 20010418; DE 69025686 D1 19960411; DE 69025686 T2 19960926; ES 2086389 T3 19960701

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050917

2001-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010729

2001-07-19 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-04-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI SE

2000-09-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000925

- Year of fee payment: 11

2000-09-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20000912

- Year of fee payment: 11

1997-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1997-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC

- Effective date: 19960930

1997-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BLANCOMME

- Effective date: 19960930

1997-02-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 19961206

1997-01-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 19961206

1996-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Effective date: 19960930

1996-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Effective date: 19960930

1996-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Effective date: 19960930

1996-09-04 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 19960306

1996-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2086389 T3

1996-06-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Effective date: 19960606

1996-05-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: EUROPATENT S.A.S.

1996-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69025686 19960411

1996-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI SE

1996-03-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Effective date: 19960306

1995-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA

1995-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BLANCOMME

1993-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19930917

1991-11-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19910920

1991-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI SE