Global Patent Index - EP 0422913 B3

EP 0422913 B3 2009-02-11 - A bite indicator

Title (en)

A bite indicator

Title (de)

Bissanzeiger

Title (fr)

Indicateur de touche

Publication

EP 0422913 B3 (EN)

Application

EP 90311093 A

Priority

  • GB 8922783 A
  • GB 8929092 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0422913A1] A bite indicator for use in indicating a bite made by a fish on a line (22) of a fishing rod (18). The bite indicator comprises a pivot member (16) which is made secure with the ground when the indicator is in use, an arm (24) which is attached to the pivot member (16) in a pivotable manner, and a part (66) which is attached to the arm (24) at a position which is spaced from the pivot member (16). When the indicator is in use, this part (66) rests on the line so that a slackening or a tightening of the line (22) will cause the arm (24) to pivot about its pivotal attachment. The indicator is so constructed that the pivot member (16) can be made secure with the ground independently of the rod (18). When the indicator is in use, the line (22) is readily disengageable from the said part (66) upon the occurence of a bite.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 97/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01K 97/125 (2013.01); A01K 97/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0422913 A1 19910417; EP 0422913 B1 19931222; EP 0422913 B3 20090211; DE 69005409 D1 19940203; DE 69005409 T2 19940601; DE 69005409 T3 20100211

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20101010

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091010

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20101009

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20101010

2010-11-03 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20101009

2010-10-31 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *FOX DESIGN INTERNATIONAL LTD

- Effective date: 20101010

2010-10-20 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20101010

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091103

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090512

2009-07-01 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: ACCORDING TO THE EUROPEAN PATENT CONVENTION ART. 105 A CHANGED TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED ON 20090423

2008-10-15 [LIM1] LIMITATION IS ADMISSIBLE

- Free text: SEQUENCE NO: 1; FILED AFTER OPPOSITION PERIOD

2007-08-03 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

1994-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

1994-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19941031

1994-09-09 [REG FR D1] DECISION OF THE DIRECTOR GENERAL TO REPORT THE DECISION OF LAPSE

1994-09-09 [REG FR R1] APPEAL

1994-07-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1994-05-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

1994-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

1994-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69005409 19940203

1993-12-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: NOVELTY SERVICE ING. DI

1993-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LU NL

1993-12-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Effective date: 19931222

1993-12-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 19931222

1993-12-22 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19931222

1992-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19920710

1991-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19910503

1991-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LU NL