EP 0422961 A1 19910417 - Silver halide photographic light-sensitive material and the process of preparing the same.
Title (en)
Silver halide photographic light-sensitive material and the process of preparing the same.
Title (de)
Lichtempfindliches photographisches Silberhalogenidmaterial und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung.
Title (fr)
Matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière et son procédé de préparation.
Publication
Application
Priority
JP 26664089 A 19891013
Abstract (en)
A method of preparing a light sensitive silver halide photographic material comprising a support and at least one silver halide emulsion layer, which method comprises coating the support with at least one composition to provide a layer having a surface temperature of not higher than 19 DEG C when a weight of water in the layer is from 2 to 8 times the weight of binder in the layer, and drying the light sensitive material for not less than 35 seconds to obtain a weight of water in the coated layer of from 2 to 8 times the weight of binder in the coated layer.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G03C 1/005 (2006.01); G03C 1/74 (2006.01); G03C 1/95 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G03C 1/005 (2013.01); G03C 1/74 (2013.01); G03C 1/95 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 5 (P-97)(883) 13 January 1982, & JP-A-56 132334 (KONISHIROKU) 16 October 1981,
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 97 (P-682)(2944) 30 March 1988, & JP-A-62 231252 (MITSUBISHI) 09 October 1987,
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 152 (P-208)(1297) 05 July 1983, & JP-A-58 62648 (FUJI) 14 April 1983,
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 90311246 A 19901015; JP 26664089 A 19891013