Global Patent Index - EP 0423516 B2

EP 0423516 B2 2001-03-07 - Scaffolding tube with connecting head

Title (en)

Scaffolding tube with connecting head

Title (de)

Gerüstrohr mit Anschlusskopf

Title (fr)

Tube d'échafaudage avec tête d'assemblage

Publication

EP 0423516 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 90118546 A

Priority

DE 3934857 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0423516A2] The connecting head (25) for scaffolds with connecting devices has a connection region (30) which comprises centring lugs (60) and possesses an annular abutment surface (51) and a conical surface (55) for creating favourable welding conditions. …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 7/00 (2006.01); E04G 7/30 (2006.01); E04G 7/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 7/307 (2013.01); E04G 7/32 (2013.01); Y10T 403/30 (2013.01); Y10T 403/3921 (2013.01); Y10T 403/4645 (2013.01); Y10T 403/479 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0423516 A2 19910424; EP 0423516 A3 19920304; EP 0423516 B1 19961127; EP 0423516 B2 20010307; AT 145696 T 19961215; CA 2027945 A1 19910420; CA 2027945 C 20000111; DE 3934857 A1 19910425; DE 59010581 D1 19970109; DK 0423516 T3 19970407; DK 0423516 T4 20010618; ES 2097125 T3 19970401; ES 2097125 T5 20010801; FI 904814 A0 19901001; FI 93136 B 19941115; FI 93136 C 19950227; JP 3043389 B2 20000522; JP H03267466 A 19911128; NO 177913 B 19950904; NO 177913 C 19951213; NO 904522 A 19910422; NO 904522 D0 19901018; PT 8464 T 19921030; PT 8464 U 19950912; PT 95621 A 19920630; US 5127757 A 19920707

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100928

2013-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130729

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100927

2012-02-13 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100927

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100926

2010-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-10-20 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20100926

2010-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-10-06 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20100927

2010-09-30 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *WILHELM LAYHER VERMOGENSVERWALTUNGS-G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100927

2010-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091008

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090912

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090908

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090917

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20090910

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090928

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090914

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-07-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: WILHELM LAYHER VERMOEGENSVERWALTUNGS-GMBH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-07-06 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-07-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2001-06-18 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2001-06-13 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2001-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-05-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2001-03-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2001-03-07 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PLETTAC AG

2000-01-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PLETTAC AG

- Effective date: 19970820

1997-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PLETTAC AG

1997-10-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PLETTAC AG

- Effective date: 19970820

1997-04-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

1997-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2097125 T3

1997-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19970220

1997-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1997-02-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

1997-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

1997-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59010581 19970109

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1996-11-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19961127

1996-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 145696 T 19961215

1993-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19930628

1992-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920502

1992-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1991-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE