Global patent index - EP 0427552 B2

EP 0427552 B2 2000-06-28 - Garment hanger

Title (en)

Garment hanger

Title (de)

Kleiderbügel

Title (fr)

Cintre

Publication

EP 0427552 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 90312237 A

Priority

GB 8925214 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0427552A1] A garment hanger is described which has a support bar (1), suspension means (2) for supporting a central portion of the support bar from a hanging rail or the like, and respective gripping means (5) at or adjacent the opposite distal extremities of the support bar, adapted to receive and releasably hold a thickness of material of a garment supported by the hanger. The hanger also comprises respective location bars (9) which extend for a substantial portion of the length of the support bar and generally therealongside on either side of the central porion. The spacing between each location bar (9) and the associated portion of the support bar (4) and the resilience of each location bar (9) is such that a garment of greater width than the length of the support bar may be laid across the hanger, releasably held by the gripping means (5) and returned behind the hanger with extreme portions of the garment width received and located between the support bar (4) and the respective location bars (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 25/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0427552 A1 19910515; EP 0427552 B1 19930310; EP 0427552 B2 20000628; DE 69001062 D1 19930415; DE 69001062 T2 19930930; DE 69001062 T3 20010322; GB 2237985 A 19910522; GB 2237985 B 19920902; GB 8925214 D0 19891228; HK 33093 A 19930416

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20101108

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2000-11-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-06-28 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR IT NL SE

1999-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

1998-11-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19981109

1998-08-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 19980601

1998-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19980601

1997-11-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19971117

- Year of fee payment: 8

1996-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19961128

- Year of fee payment: 7

1995-01-31 [EAL] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN

- Ref Legal Event Code: EAL

1994-04-05 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: W. WILLPUETZ KUNSTSTOFFVERARBEITUNGS GMBH

1994-02-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: W. WILLPUETZ KUNSTSTOFFVERARBEITUNGS GMBH

- Effective date: 19931208

1993-07-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

1993-04-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69001062

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1993-04-15

1993-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR IT NL SE

1993-03-10 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19930310

1993-03-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19930310

1993-03-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19930310

1993-03-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 19930310

1993-03-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19930310

1992-08-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR IT NL SE

1991-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19910927

1991-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19910823

1991-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE