Global Patent Index - EP 0438421 B2

EP 0438421 B2 2000-04-26 - IMPROVED PROCESS FOR HIGH SPEED, MULTI-END POLYESTER HIGH PERFORMANCE TIRE AND INDUSTRIAL YARN

Title (en)

IMPROVED PROCESS FOR HIGH SPEED, MULTI-END POLYESTER HIGH PERFORMANCE TIRE AND INDUSTRIAL YARN

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHLEISTUNGSFÄHIGEM MULTIENDPOLYESTER FÜR HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSREIFEN UND FÜR INDUSTRIEGARN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE AMELIORE DE PRODUCTION A VITESSE ELEVEE, DE PNEU ET DE FIL INDUSTRIEL EN POLYESTER DE HAUT RENDEMENT A MULTIPLES EXTREMITES

Publication

EP 0438421 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 89910037 A

Priority

  • US 8903230 W
  • US 25828188 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US4851172A] An improvement in a high speed process to produce high performance multi-end polyester yarn comprises extruding molten polyester from a spinnerette to form filaments, then cooling, lubricating and advancing the filaments to a forwarding roll system at the speed of from about 1000-4000 meters per minute so that a partially oriented yarn is produced, then feeding the filaments from the forwarding roll system to a first draw roll system to partially draw the yarn, then feeding the paritally drawn yarn to a second draw roll system having a draw point localizing device then feeding the filaments from the draw roll system to a conditioning roll system and finally taking up the filaments. The improvement is the use of matte finish on godet rolls having an arithmetic mean roll surface roughness value of from between about 35 microinches and about 120 microinches to feed and withdraw yarn to and from a draw point localizing device in the second draw roll system. This combination enables multiple ends of the filaments to be advanced through a single set of forwarding, drawing and conditioning rolls and yarn mechanical quality remains at a high level of acceptance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 6/62; D01D 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/62 (2006.01); D01D 5/16 (2006.01); D02G 3/48 (2006.01); D02J 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/16 (2013.01); D02J 1/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

US 4851172 A 19890725; AU 4202389 A 19900501; AU 636852 B2 19930513; BR 8907707 A 19910730; CA 1328156 C 19940405; CN 1041791 A 19900502; CN 1070935 C 20010912; DE 68926346 D1 19960530; DE 68926346 T2 19960905; DE 68926346 T3 20001214; EP 0438421 A1 19910731; EP 0438421 B1 19960424; EP 0438421 B2 20000426; ES 2015802 A6 19900901; JP 2749168 B2 19980513; JP H04501141 A 19920227; KR 0136113 B1 19980428; MX 165164 B 19921029; TR 26223 A 19940127; WO 9004055 A1 19900419

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2006-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-07-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060705

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-04-28 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2006-04-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PERFORMANCE FIBERS INC.

- Free text: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.#101 COLUMBIA ROAD#MORRISTON, NJ 07962 (US) -TRANSFER TO- PERFORMANCE FIBERS INC.#338 PEA RIDGE ROAD#MONCURE, NC 27559 (US)

2006-04-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

- Free text: ALLIED-SIGNAL INC.#COLUMBIA ROAD AND PARK AVENUE P.O. BOX 2245R#MORRISTOWN/NJ (US) -TRANSFER TO- HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.#101 COLUMBIA ROAD#MORRISTON, NJ 07962 (US)

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050726

2006-02-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-02-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-08-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050726

2005-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050726

2004-09-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040914

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-06-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040615

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-06-16 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-05-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-04-26 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1997-03-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL N.V.

- Effective date: 19970124

1996-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 68926346 19960530

1996-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-04-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1994-07-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940527

1994-03-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALLIEDSIGNAL INC.

1992-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROWAN, HUGH, HARVEY

1992-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NEAL, JAMES, GORDON

1991-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19910326

1991-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI