Global Patent Index - EP 0446316 B2

EP 0446316 B2 2001-12-05 - MINIATURE FAN

Title (en)

MINIATURE FAN

Title (de)

KLEINVENTILATOR

Title (fr)

PETIT VENTILATEUR

Publication

EP 0446316 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 90913243 A

Priority

  • CH 354089 A
  • CH 9000223 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9105169A1] The miniature fan has a plastic air-guide casing (2) in which is rotatably fitted an impeller (1) in the form of a meridian-flow fan. The blades (1a) of the impeller (1) are not twisted and exhibit the same pitch over their entire depth. The leading edges (1b) of the impeller, the front of the hub (1c) and the front of the casing (2d) lie in about the same plane. Meridian-flow fans have the advantage over the axial type of providing greater power density with less noise.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 25/06; F04D 29/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/38 (2006.01); F04D 25/06 (2006.01); F04D 29/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/0606 (2013.01); F04D 29/325 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9105169 A1 19910418; DE 59004520 D1 19940317; EP 0446316 A1 19910918; EP 0446316 B1 19940202; EP 0446316 B2 20011205; HU 210777 B 19950728; HU 907760 D0 19910729; HU T62375 A 19930428; JP 3090216 B2 20000918; JP H04502052 A 19920409; US 5217351 A 19930608

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-06-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 19940202

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2001-12-05 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

2001-08-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010820

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-08-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010817

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-08-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010813

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-07-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010718

- Year of fee payment: 12

1994-12-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PAPST-MOTOREN GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 19941031

1994-06-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1994-04-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19940308

1994-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59004520 19940317

1994-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

1994-02-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Effective date: 19940202

1994-02-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Effective date: 19940202

1994-02-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19940202

1994-02-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19940202

1994-02-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19940202

1992-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19921029

1991-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19910522

1991-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE