Global patent index - EP 0446447 B2

EP 0446447 B2 2000-11-22 - Yarn delivering device

Title (en)

Yarn delivering device

Title (de)

Liefervorrichtung für laufende Fäden

Title (fr)

Dispositif fournisseur de fil

Publication

EP 0446447 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 90123730 A

Priority

DE 4007131 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0446447A1] The invention relates to a delivery device for running yarns, especially for use on textile machines, having a storage drum (11), to which the yarn (F) is fed in the rear region by means of a yarn-guide tube (9) encircling the storage drum and from which the yarn (F) is drawn off overhead by means of a yarn draw-off eye (19). To allow as simple an automatic threading of the yarn (F) as possible by means of compressed air, it proposes that a deflection, directed radially inwards towards the yarn draw-off eye (19), of the yarn end flying freely in a plane vertically above the yarn draw-off eye (19) should take place, this being achieved solely by means of a suction-air flow lying on the outer surface of the head cone (16). …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34; B65H 51/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/16 (2006.01); B65H 51/22 (2006.01); B65H 51/28 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/364 (2013.01); B65H 51/16 (2013.01); B65H 57/003 (2013.01); D03D 47/34 (2013.01); D03D 47/366 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0446447 A1 19910918; EP 0446447 B1 19950705; EP 0446447 B2 20001122; AT 124732 T 19950715; AT 253134 T 20031115; BR 9100911 A 19911105; CN 1026424 C 19941102; CN 1054624 A 19910918; CS 9100584 A2 19910915; CZ 281399 B6 19960911; DE 4007131 A1 19910912; DE 4007131 C2 19991230; EP 0657379 A2 19950614; EP 0659918 A2 19950628; EP 0659918 A3 19971119; EP 0659918 B1 20031029; ES 2074112 T3 19950901; JP 3021712 B2 20000315; JP H04213561 A 19920804; US 5181544 A 19930126

INPADOC legal status

2014-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081210

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20101210

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19981231

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOC. DE BREVETS INDUSTRIELS-ETABLISSEMENT *SOBREVI

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-12-05 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061205

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-10-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-01-10 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020110

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-12-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-03-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010304

2001-02-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-12-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-12-08 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2000-11-22 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-11-22 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Ref Legal Event Code: XX

- Free Format Text: TEILANMELDUNG 94116058.2 EINGEREICHT AM 10/12/90.

1999-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 19981210

1998-12-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19981211

1998-12-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19981210

1997-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19971230

- Year of fee payment: 8

1997-12-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19971218

- Year of fee payment: 8

1997-10-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19971015

- Year of fee payment: 8

1997-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 19970701

1997-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19970701

1996-12-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19961210

1996-12-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19961210

1996-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: IRO AB

1996-01-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: IRO AB

- Effective date: 19951208

1995-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19951230

- Year of fee payment: 6

1995-12-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19951213

- Year of fee payment: 6

1995-11-01 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19951101

- Year of fee payment: 6

1995-09-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1995-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2074112

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

1995-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 19950720

1995-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59009377

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1995-08-10

1995-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1995-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1995-07-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19950705

1995-07-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19950705

1995-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 124732

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 1995-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1995-07-05 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Ref Legal Event Code: XX

- Free Format Text: TEILANMELDUNG 94116058.2 EINGEREICHT AM 10/12/90.

1993-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19930824

1991-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19910912

1991-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE