Global Patent Index - EP 0450064 B1

EP 0450064 B1 2000-04-19 - DIGITAL SPEECH CODER HAVING IMPROVED SUB-SAMPLE RESOLUTION LONG-TERM PREDICTOR

Title (en)

DIGITAL SPEECH CODER HAVING IMPROVED SUB-SAMPLE RESOLUTION LONG-TERM PREDICTOR

Title (de)

NUMERISCHER SPRACHKODIERER MIT VERBESSERTER LANGZEITVORHERSAGE DURCH SUBABTASTAUFLÖSUNG

Title (fr)

CODEUR DE PAROLE NUMERIQUE A PREDICTEUR A LONG TERME AMELIORE A RESOLUTION AU NIVEAU SOUS-ECHANTILLON

Publication

EP 0450064 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 91905041 A

Priority

  • US 9003625 W
  • US 40220689 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9103790A1] A digital speech coder includes a long-term filter (124) having an improved sub-sample resolution long-term predictor which allows for subsample resolution for the lag parameter L. A frame of N samples of input speech vector s(n) is applied to an adder (510). The output of the adder (510) produces the output vector b(n) for the long term filter (124). The output vector b(n) is fed back to a delayed vector generator block (530) of the long-term predictor. The nominal long-term predictor lag parameter L is also input to the delayed vector generator block (530). The long-term predictor lag parameter L can take on non-integer values, which may be multiples of one half, one third, one fourth or any other rational fraction. The delayed vector generator (530) includes a memory which holds past samples of b(n). In addition, interpolated samples of b(n) are also calculated by the delayed vector generator (530) and stored in its memory, at least one interpolated sample being calculated and stored between each past sample of b(n). The delayed vector generator (530) provides output vector q(n) to the long-term multiplier block (520), which scales the long-term predictor response by the long-term predictor coefficient beta . The scaled output beta q(n) is then applied to the adder (510) to complete the feedback loop of the recursive filter (124).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 19/08; G10L 19/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/10 (2006.01); G10L 19/12 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9103790 A1 19910321; AT 191987 T 20000515; AU 5952590 A 19910408; AU 634795 B2 19930304; CA 2037899 A1 19910302; CA 2037899 C 19960917; CN 1026275 C 19941019; CN 1050633 A 19910410; DE 69033510 D1 20000525; DE 69033510 T2 20001123; DE 69033510 T3 20070606; DK 0450064 T3 20001002; DK 0450064 T4 20060904; EP 0450064 A1 19911009; EP 0450064 A4 19950405; EP 0450064 B1 20000419; EP 0450064 B2 20060809; ES 2145737 T3 20000716; ES 2145737 T5 20070301; JP 3268360 B2 20020325; JP H04502675 A 19920514; MX 167644 B 19930331; SG 47028 A1 19980320

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-23 [REG DE R040] WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R040

- Ref Document Number: 69033510

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-30 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 69033510

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100625

2013-03-21 [REG DE R039] REVOCATION ACTION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: R039

- Ref Document Number: 69033510

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121001

2012-10-01 [REG DE R008] CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R008

- Ref Document Number: 69033510

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100624

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100626

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100625

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20100626

2010-07-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2010-07-14 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20100624

2010-07-12 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

2010-07-07 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20100625

2010-06-30 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *MOTOROLA INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BE20

- Effective date: 20100625

2010-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090605

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090710

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090507

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090507

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090605

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090605

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090511

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090611

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-03-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

2006-11-17 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2006-11-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2006-10-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-09-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2006-09-19 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RPEO

2006-09-04 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T4

2006-08-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2006-08-09 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2006-08-09 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC2

- IPC: G10L 19/12 20060101AFI20060703BHEP

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (PUBL)

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: SAGEM SA

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: EADS DEFENCE AND SECURITY NETWORKS

2001-03-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (PUBL)

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-03-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SAGEM SA

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-03-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: EADS DEFENCE AND SECURITY NETWORKS

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-03-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (PUBL)

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-03-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SAGEM SA

- Effective date: 20010116

2000-10-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: JOHN P. MUNZINGER INGENIEUR-CONSEIL

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2145737

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69033510

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-25

2000-05-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 191987

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 10L 19/08 A, 7G 10L 19/12 B, 7G 10L 101:12 Z

1996-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19961022

1995-04-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19950216

1995-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1993-07-28 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17P

- Effective date: 19910430

1991-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19910502

1991-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE