Global patent index - EP 0455183 B2

EP 0455183 B2 2001-04-25 - Autonomous radio-controlled clock

Title (en)

Autonomous radio-controlled clock

Title (de)

Autonome Funkuhr

Title (fr)

Horloge radio-commandée autonome

Publication

EP 0455183 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 91106884 A

Priority

DE 9005073 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5105396A] An autonomous radio timepiece (1), in particular small, portable timepiece such as a travel alarm clock or a wrist watch includes a display (25) of the prevailing radio field intensity. The display (25) is capable of simultaneously signaling the actuation of a receiver (14) for the decoding of absolute time information and is conveniently combined, in the form of a bar graph, with day indicator flags adjacent a day-of-the-week display (26). When operating outside the time zone for which the transmitter emits the coded absolute time information, the time piece may be manually switched to the instantaneously prevailing time zone. The number of time zone changes may be entered and displayed, or the prevailing hour (H) of the time zone involved is entered, from which an electro-mechanical time display (18) then continues to advance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04G 7/02; G04G 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04G 9/00 (2006.01); G04R 20/08 (2013.01); G04R 60/04 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04G 9/0076 (2013.01); G04G 7/02 (2013.01); G04G 9/0064 (2013.01); G04R 20/08 (2013.01); G04R 60/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0455183 A2 19911106; EP 0455183 A3 19920115; EP 0455183 B1 19950628; EP 0455183 B2 20010425; DE 9010270 U1 19910905; ES 2075257 T3 19951001; HK 73296 A 19960503; US 5105396 A 19920414; US 5105396 B1 19931130

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050427

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-04-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020422

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-04-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020417

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20020204

2002-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020201

2001-10-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 19950628

2001-09-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-05-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2001-04-25 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-04-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010417

- Year of fee payment: 11

2000-06-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000615

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-05-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20000403

1998-04-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19980428

1997-04-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19970411

- Year of fee payment: 7

1996-05-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ETA SA FABRIQUES D'EBAUCHES

- Effective date: 19960320

1995-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2075257

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

1995-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1995-09-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1995-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 19950807

1995-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59105829

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1995-08-03

1995-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1995-06-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19950628

1995-06-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19950628

1994-05-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19940331

1992-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19920110

1992-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1991-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI